Seven Corners, Inc. v. Stanford Hospital And Clinics
Plaintiff: Seven Corners, Inc.
Defendant: Stanford Hospital And Clinics
Case Number: 5:2012cv04679
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER 24 of Dismissal With Prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/16/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER 22 to Continue the May 10, 2013 Case Management Conference to May 17, 2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/8/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER 19 to Continue the April 26, 2013 Case Management Conference to May 10, 2013. Case Management Conference Re: Settlement set for 5/10/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/18/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER 14 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/21/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER 12 to Continue the Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/9/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seven Corners, Inc. v. Stanford Hospital And Clinics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Hospital And Clinics
Represented By: Sara Hilary Frisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seven Corners, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Marion Rimac
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?