Shaw v. Karan & N. Inc et al
Plaintiff: Cecil Shaw
Defendant: Corinne R Wagner, Karan & N. Inc and Lorena Soto Mayor DeFlores
Case Number: 5:2012cv04687
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 59 Motion for Summary Judgment (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013). The clerk shall close this file.
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 39 Motion for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses; denying 45 Motion for Apportionment of Liability for Attorney Fees and Litigation Expenses. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER on 36 Consent Decree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on June 11, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd GRANTING 16 Motion to Amend/Correct; Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document. The hearing previously set for January 29, 2013 is VACATED. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Karan & N. Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinne R Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karan & N. Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorena Soto Mayor DeFlores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Shaw
Represented By: Kenneth Randolph Moore
Represented By: Tanya Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?