Marlon Jessie Blacher v. L S McEwen
Petitioner: Marlon Jessie Blacher
Respondent: L. S. McEwen
Case Number: 5:2012cv04775
Filed: September 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 54 Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting Respondent's Motion to Dismiss in Part 23 ; Denying Motion for Relief 44 ; Denying Motion for Leave to Amend Prayer 47 by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER for Further Briefing. Respondent Shall File Supplemental Briefing by 2/25/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/3/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying 4 Motion for Order Directing Law Librarian to Provide Copies. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/27/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Granting Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Habeas Answer due by 2/1/2013. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/30/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marlon Jessie Blacher v. L S McEwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marlon Jessie Blacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L. S. McEwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?