J&J Sports Production, Inc v. Ayala
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Production, Inc
Defendant: Felipe Ayala
Case Number: 5:2012cv04830
Filed: September 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/12/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 12/18/2013. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/20/2013. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 17 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/05/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Suggesting Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/25/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 11 Stipulation (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Production, Inc v. Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Production, Inc
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?