Ramachandran v. Accenture, LLP
Plaintiff: Eleanor Ramachandran
Defendant: Accenture, LLP
Case Number: 5:2012cv04834
Filed: September 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 Notice of Settlement. Expert discovery and summary judgment proceedings suspended. Parties to file dismissal within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/5/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re Rebuttal Expert Deadline. Deadline for designation of rebuttal experts with reports: 9/16/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/2/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 34 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. Defendant's request for discovery granted in part and denied in part. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (1) denying 8 plaintiff's Motion to Remand; and (2) Re-Setting Initial Case Management Conference. Initial case management conference set for 12/11/2012, 1:30 PM. All related deadlines adjusted accordingly. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramachandran v. Accenture, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Ramachandran
Represented By: Christopher Robert Le Clerc
Represented By: Stephen F. Danz
Represented By: Christopher R. LeClerc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accenture, LLP
Represented By: G. Daniel Newland
Represented By: Robert Brian Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?