Golden Bridge Technology Inc v. Apple Inc et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Golden Bridge Technology Inc
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv04882
Filed: September 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2012 Filing 253 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RE COURT DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO EITHER CONSENT OR DECLINE TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: 11/13/2012 Case Management Conference reset to 10/9/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2012. Each party who has not already done so shall file either a Consent or Declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge no later than 10/2/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 18, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 18, 2012 Filing 252 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 18, 2012 Filing 251 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:12-cv-04014. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 12, 2012 TRANSMITTAL of documents: Entire case and documents electronically transferred to USDC Northern District of California at San Francisco on 9/12/12. (lc)
September 12, 2012 Filing 250 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 order to sever and to Transfer) (lc)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEVER AND TRANSFER 136 , 143 , 154 , 155 by Judge Otis D Wright, II: Defendants motions to sever are GRANTED. Motorola Mobility, Amazon.com, Dell, and Apple are hereby severed from this case. In addition, the Court sua sponte severs the remaining Defendants from this case. All Defendants except Apple are hereby dismissed. Apples motion to transfer to the Northern District of California is GRANTED. Motorola Mobility, Amazon.com, and Dells motions to transfer are DENIED for lack of jurisdiction.The Court is also in receipt of the report regarding venue. 248 .Defendants have indicated the respective jurisdictions they believe are the proper (and most convenient) venues for their respective cases. Golden Bridge Technology, Inc is encouraged to refile its Complaints in those jurisdictions. If Golden Bridge Technology, Inc decides to refile here, it must file notices of related cases under L.R. 83-1.3. However, as is hopefully clear, the Court is inclined to grant motions to transfer, to ensure the most convenient venue for the litigants.(MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (Attachments: # 1 CV 22) (lc)
September 5, 2012 Filing 248 REPORT RE VENUE PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S AUGUST 29, 2012 ORDER re MOTION to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue 143 , MOTION to Sever Motorola Mobility LLC and Dismiss or, In the Alternative, to Transfer 136 , MOTION to Sever Dell Inc. MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Texas 154 , MOTION to Sever Apple Inc. MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California 155 filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, Counter Defendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (Hadley, Lawrence)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II:Having heard the parties arguments and concerns regarding severance andtransfer, the Court hereby orders all Defendants to provide to Plaintiffs counsel, the venue where each Defendant believes is the bona fide proper venue for this litigation. Defendants will provide this information by September 4, 2012. Plaintiff shall file areport with the Court via ECF, by September 6, 2012, conveying the informationprovided by Defendants. Upon receipt of the report, the Court will consider thedisposition of the pending motions in case. (lc)
August 28, 2012 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Graham Marc Buccigross on behalf of Defendants Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC BVI Corp, HTC Corp (Buccigross, Graham)
August 27, 2012 Filing 244 MINUTES: MOTION to Sever Motorola Mobility LLC 136 ; MOTION to SeverClaims 143 ; MOTION to Sever Dell Inc. 154 ; MOTION to Sever Apple Inc by Apple 155 : Case called, appearances made. The Court hears oral argument from counsel. The Motions to sever ONLY are all granted. Counsel are ordered to return for an in chambers Status Conference regarding case management on August 29, 2012 at 1:30 pm. by Judge Otis D Wright II Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (ir)
August 25, 2012 Filing 245 Notice of Electronic Filing re Answer to Counterclaim 239 , Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) 228 , Answer to Counterclaim 233 , Answer to Counterclaim 240 , Answer to Counterclaim 242 , Answer to Counterclaim 234 , Answer to Counterclaim 235 , Answer to Counterclaim 241 , Answer to Counterclaim 230 , Answer to Counterclaim 236 , Answer to Counterclaim 231 , Answer to Counterclaim 229 , Answer to Counterclaim 237 , Answer to Counterclaim 238 , Answer to Counterclaim 232 e-mailed to awright@park-law.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'#5.1.0 Address rejected.'. Primary e-mail address is correct. Issues with their mail server. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'#5.1.0 Address rejected.'. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 25, 2012 Filing 242 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Barnes & Noble, Inc. and Barnesandnoble.com LLC [D.I. 214] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 241 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Apple, Inc. [D.I. 208] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 240 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Pantech Co., Ltd. and Pantech Wireless, Inc. [D.I. 177] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 239 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Sony Electronics, Inc. and Sony Corporation of America [D.I. 178] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 238 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Dell, Inc. [D.I. 203] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 237 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Research In Motion Corporation and Research In Motion Limited [D.I. 185] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 236 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Sierra Wireless of America, Inc. [D.I. 206] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 235 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Amazon.com,Inc. [D.I. 205] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 234 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Lenovo (United States) Inc., and Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. [D.I. 207] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 233 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of ZTE (U.S.A.), Inc. [D.I. 202] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 232 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of HTC Corp., HTC (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America, Inc. and Exedea Inc. [D.I. 210] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 231 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc's ANSWER to Counterclaims of LG Electronics USA, Inc. and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. [D.I. 215] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 230 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company [D.I. 201] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 229 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC [D.I. 204] filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
August 25, 2012 Filing 228 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Barnesandnoble.com Inc, Lenovo Group Ltd, Sony Kabushiki Kaisha, ZTE Corporation. (Hadley, Lawrence)
August 24, 2012 Filing 243 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, 151 JURY DEMAND; COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendant LG Electronics Inc.(lc) (lc).
August 24, 2012 Filing 227 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant LG Electronics Inc of Answer to First Amended Complaint with Counterclaims. (May, Olga)
August 22, 2012 Filing 226 SUPPLEMENT AUTHORITY TO PLAINTIFF GBT'S COMBINED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO SEVER, DISMISS OR TO TRANSFER FILED BY DEFENDANTS MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., APPLE INC. AND DELL INC. filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, Counter Defendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Irving, Jeanne)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 224 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas L. Halkowski on behalf of Defendants LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc, LG Electronics USA Inc., designating Olga I. May as local counsel. (lt)
August 16, 2012 Filing 224 APPLICATION for attorney Thomas L. Halkowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10823382 paid.) filed by Defendant LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc, LG Electronics USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A - List of Defendants, # 2 Cert of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(May, Olga)
August 14, 2012 Filing 223 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff Dell Inc, re Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) 221 and Reply Declaration of James W. Morando in Support [Dkt. 221-1 and 221-2] served on 8/13/12. (Morando, James)
August 14, 2012 Filing 222 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Report 220 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
August 13, 2012 Filing 221 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Sever Dell Inc. MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Texas 154 filed by Counter Claimant Dell Inc, Defendant Dell Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A (to Declaration of James W. Morando))(Morando, James)
August 13, 2012 Filing 220 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Defendants Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Hanson, Eric)
August 13, 2012 Filing 219 REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Sever Motorola Mobility LLC and Dismiss or, In the Alternative, to Transfer 136 filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin James Sangston, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Taillieu, Olivier)
August 13, 2012 Filing 218 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue 143 filed by Counter Claimants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Robert T. Cruzen in Support of Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.'s Motion to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Cruzen Supplemental Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Cruzen Supplemental Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Cruzen Supplemental Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Cruzen Supplemental Declaration)(Cruzen, Robert)
August 13, 2012 Filing 217 REPLY in support MOTION to Sever Apple Inc. MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California 155 filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Teter, Timothy)
August 13, 2012 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jennifer Hayes on behalf of Defendant Sierra Wireless America Inc (Hayes, Jennifer)
August 10, 2012 Filing 211 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Brian James Dunne counsel for Counter Claimants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC, Defendants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC. Changing firm name to Olavi Dunne LLP. Changing email to bdunne@olavidunne.com.Brian James Dunne is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Barnes & Noble Inc. and barnesandnoble.com llc (Dunne, Brian)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II ORDERING answer to FAC; declaratory judgmetn counterclaims submitted by (party not named) received on 8/6/12 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (lc)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II ORDERING answer to FAC; counterclaim submitted by Defendant Barnes and Noble Inc received on 8/6/12 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (lc)
August 7, 2012 Filing 207 ANSWER and Defenses to First Amended Complaint 151 ; and COUNTERCLAIMS against Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. (gk) (jp). (Main Document 207 replaced on 8/10/2012) (gk).
August 7, 2012 Filing 200 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimants Lenovo Holding Company Inc, Lenovo United States Inc, Defendants Lenovo Holding Company Inc, Lenovo United States Inc of Answer and Counterclaims. (Stein, David)
August 6, 2012 Filing 215 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 151 JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendants LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc, LG Electronics USA Inc.(lc)
August 6, 2012 Filing 214 ANSWER to Amended Complaint 151 JURY DEMAND; COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendant Barnes and Noble Inc.(lc)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: (Document not indicated on discrepancy) received on 8/1/12 was missing caption is to be filed and processed. The filing date is ORDERED to be the date the document was stamped "received but not filed" with the Clerk. (ir)
August 6, 2012 Filing 208 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint 151 ; and COUNTERCLAIMS against Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Apple Inc. (gk)
August 6, 2012 Filing 206 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to the First Amended Complaint 151 ; and COUNTERCLAIMS against Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimants Sierra Wireless, Inc. and Sierra Wireless America, Inc. (gk) (gk).
August 6, 2012 Filing 205 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint 151 ; and COUNTERCLAIMS against Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Amazon.com, Inc. (gk) (gk).
August 6, 2012 Filing 204 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint 151 ; and COUNTERCLAIMS against Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (gk) (gk).
August 6, 2012 Filing 203 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint 151 ; and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Dell Inc. (gk) (gk). (Main Document 203 replaced on 8/10/2012) (gk).
August 6, 2012 Filing 202 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint 151 ; and COUNTERCLAIMS against Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant ZTE (USA) Inc. (gk) (gk).
August 6, 2012 Filing 201 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint 151 ; and COUNTERCLAIMS against Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Hewlett-Packard Company. (gk) (gk).
August 6, 2012 Filing 199 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 151 JURY DEMAND. Defenses and Counterclaims of Defendants Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. to First Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement filed by Defendants Lenovo Group Ltd, Lenovo Holding Company Inc, Lenovo United States Inc.(Stein, David)
August 6, 2012 Filing 198 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company of Answer And Counterclaims Of Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company To First Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement. (Harvey, Leslie)
August 6, 2012 Filing 197 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 151 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant ZTE Solutions Inc.(Miller, Scott)
August 6, 2012 Filing 196 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ZTE USA Inc, identifying ZTE Corporation. (Miller, Scott)
August 6, 2012 Filing 195 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Sierra Wireless America Inc, Sierra Wireless Inc of Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint. (Lopez, Ronald)
August 6, 2012 Filing 194 DECLARATION of Elmer Yuen opposition MOTION to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue 143 , MOTION to Sever Motorola Mobility LLC and Dismiss or, In the Alternative, to Transfer 136 , MOTION to Sever Dell Inc. MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Texas 154 , MOTION to Sever Apple Inc. MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California 155 filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, Counter Defendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (Irving, Jeanne)
August 6, 2012 Filing 193 DECLARATION of Lawrence M. Hadley opposition MOTION to Sever Motorola Mobility LLC and Dismiss or, In the Alternative, to Transfer 136 , MOTION to Sever Dell Inc. MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Texas 154 , MOTION to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue 143 , MOTION to Sever Apple Inc. MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California 155 filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, Counter Defendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66)(Irving, Jeanne)
August 6, 2012 Filing 192 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 189 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Irving, Jeanne)
August 6, 2012 Filing 191 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,, 151 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Taillieu, Olivier)
August 6, 2012 Filing 190 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC of Barnes & Noble, Inc. and Barnesandnoble.com LLC's Answer and Defenses to Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement and Counterclaims. (Eiseman, David)
August 6, 2012 Filing 189 OPPOSITION Opposition re: MOTION to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue 143 , MOTION to Sever Motorola Mobility LLC and Dismiss or, In the Alternative, to Transfer 136 , MOTION to Sever Dell Inc. MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Texas 154 , MOTION to Sever Apple Inc. MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California 155 filed by Counter Defendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc, Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (Irving, Jeanne)
August 6, 2012 Filing 188 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Dell Inc of Dell Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement and Counterclaims; Demand for Jury Trial. (Morando, James)
August 6, 2012 Filing 187 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc, LG Electronics USA Inc of Answer to First Amended Complaint and Counterclaims. (May, Olga)
August 6, 2012 Filing 186 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc of Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Cruzen, Robert)
August 6, 2012 Filing 184 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant Apple Inc, Defendant Apple Inc of Apple Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement and Counterclaims. (Mead, Lowell)
August 3, 2012 Filing 185 ANSWER to Amended Complaint 151 ; and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.; with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Research In Motion Limited and Research In Motion Corporation. (gk) (gk).
August 3, 2012 Filing 183 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Research In Motion Limited (Beatty, Christopher)
August 3, 2012 Filing 182 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Research In Motion Corporation of DEFENDANTS RIM CORP. AND RIM LTD.'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM TO PLAINTIFF GOLDEN BRIDGE TECHNOLOGY, INC.'S, AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. (Beatty, Christopher)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 176 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alan A. Wright on behalf of Defendant Pantech Co, and Pantech Wireless, Inc., designating Gordon I. Endow as local counsel. (lt)
August 2, 2012 Filing 179 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by Defendant Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless Inc, identifying Other AffiliateS Woori Bank,Qualcomm, InterDigital Inc, National Agricultural Cooperative Federation - Nonghyup, Korea Development Bank for Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless Inc. (lom) (lom).
August 1, 2012 Filing 210 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint 151 and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants HTC Corp, HTC BVI Corp, HTC America Inc, and Exedea Inc.(ir)
August 1, 2012 Filing 180 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless Inc. (lom) (lom).
August 1, 2012 Filing 178 ANSWER to FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 151 AND COUNTERCLAIMS; JURY TRIAL DEMAND against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by Defendants Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc. (lom) (lom).
August 1, 2012 Filing 177 ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 151 and COUNTERCLAIM; Jury Trial Demanded against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by Defendants Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless Inc. (lom) (lom).
August 1, 2012 Filing 176 APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT Attorney Alan A Wright to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID), filed by defendants Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless Inc. Lodged Order. (jp)
August 1, 2012 Filing 175 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless Inc of Answer and Counterclaims, Certification of Interested Parties, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case. (Endow, Gordon)
July 30, 2012 Filing 174 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Amazon.com,Inc. Defendant filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 30, 2012 Filing 173 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Dell Defendant filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 30, 2012 Filing 172 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Lenovo Defendants filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 30, 2012 Filing 171 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Barnes & Noble Defendants filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 30, 2012 Filing 170 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of HTC Defendants filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 30, 2012 Filing 169 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Sony Defendants filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 30, 2012 Filing 168 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Sierra Wireless Defendant filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 30, 2012 Filing 167 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of LG Electronics Defendants filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 30, 2012 Filing 166 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of Samsung Defendants filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D Wright II: ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION, the MOTION to Sever Motorola Mobility LLC 136 ; MOTION to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue 143 ; MOTION to Sever Dell Inc. 154 ; MOTION to Sever Apple Inc 155 is hereby continued to August 27, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. (sch)
July 27, 2012 Filing 164 Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaims of ZTE Solutions Inc. filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 157 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Fred I. Williams on behalf of Defendant Lenovo United States Inc., designating David Stein as local counsel. (lt)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER DENYING 161 PLAINTIFFS EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Alternatively, Oppositions or To Set A Common Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on All Motions to Sever and Transfer. (lc) Modified on 7/26/2012 (lc).
July 25, 2012 Filing 161 EXPARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Alternatively, Oppositions or To Set A Common Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on All Motions to Sever and Transfer filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 25, 2012 Filing 160 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Fred I. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10716855 paid.) 157 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Application does not specify which defendant attorney represents. Order states that attorney represents Plaintiff. It is unclear who this attorney represents. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
July 25, 2012 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric B Hanson on behalf of Defendants Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Hanson, Eric)
July 25, 2012 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeanne E Irving on behalf of Counter Defendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc, Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc (Irving, Jeanne)
July 25, 2012 Filing 157 APPLICATION for attorney Fred I. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10716855 paid.) filed by Defendants Lenovo Group Ltd, Lenovo Holding Company Inc, Lenovo United States Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Stein, David)
July 24, 2012 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher Dale Beatty on behalf of Defendant Research In Motion Corporation (Beatty, Christopher)
July 23, 2012 Filing 155 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever Apple Inc., MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Defendant/Counter-Claimant Apple Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Sever and Transfer, # 2 Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of Motion to Sever and Transfer, # 3 Declaration of Lowell D. Mead in Support of Motion to Sever and Transfer, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 7 Exhibit D to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 8 Exhibit E to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 9 Exhibit F to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 10 Exhibit G to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 11 Exhibit H to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 12 Exhibit I to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 13 Exhibit J to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 14 Exhibit K to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 15 Exhibit L to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 16 Exhibit M to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 17 Exhibit N to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 18 Exhibit O to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 19 Exhibit P to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 20 Exhibit Q to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 21 Exhibit R to Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, # 22 Proposed Order)(Teter, Timothy)
July 23, 2012 Filing 154 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever Dell Inc., MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Texas filed by defendant Dell Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Sever and Transfer, # 2 Declaration of George Huang in Support of Motion to Sever and Transfer, # 3 Declaration of Mathew A. Hollander In Support of Motion to Sever and Transfer, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Matthew A. Hollander, # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Matthew A. Hollander, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Matthew A. Hollander, # 7 Exhibit D to Declaration of Matthew A. Hollander, # 8 Exhibit E to Declaration of Matthew A. Hollander, # 9 Exhibit F to Declaration of Matthew A. Hollander, # 10 Exhibit G to Declaration of Matthew A. Hollander, # 11 Exhibit H to Declaration of Matthew A. Hollander, # 12 Exhibit I to Declaration of Matthew A. Hollander, # 13 Proposed Order)(Morando, James)
July 23, 2012 Filing 153 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amazon Amendment (Motion related) 152 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event and incorrect format selected. Pdf attempted to change motion hearing from 8/13/12 to 8/20/12 by filing same motion with new hearing date. Now one motion has 2 different motion hearing dates. Note: the wrong event amendment did NOT continue the hearing #143. Documents should have been prepared in a proper format seeking an order of court to continue a pending motion, to which a proposed order would have been submitted as a separate attachment thereto. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 20, 2012 Filing 152 Amendment to MOTION to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue 143 New Hearing Date: August 20, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue, # 2 Declaration of David Zapolsky in Support of Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue, # 3 Declaration of Robert T. Cruzen in Support of Motion to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Robert T. Cruzen, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Robert T. Cruzen, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Robert T. Cruzen, # 7 Proposed Order)(Cruzen, Robert)
July 18, 2012 Filing 151 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Amazon.com Inc, Apple Inc, Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC, Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC BVI Corp, HTC Corp, Hewlett-Packard Company, LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc, LG Electronics USA Inc, Lenovo Group Ltd, Lenovo Holding Company Inc, Lenovo United States Inc, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Palm Inc, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless Inc, Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sierra Wireless America Inc, Sierra Wireless Inc, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc, Sony Kabushiki Kaisha, ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc, ZTE USA Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc (lc)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II, re Stipulation 145 the first amended complaint attached as exhibit 1 shalll be filed. (lc)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II, re Stipulation 146 Golden BridgeTechnology, Inc.s claims against Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and SamsungElectronics America, Inc.s counterclaims against Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.are dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees. (lc)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II, re Stipulation 147 Golden BridgeTechnology, Inc.s claims against Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. and SamsungSemiconductor, Inc.s counterclaims against Golden Bridge Technology, Inc. aredismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs, expenses, andattorneys fees. (lc)
July 18, 2012 Filing 147 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Samsung Semiconductor Inc filed by defendant Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Dismissal without Prejudice)(Snyder, Darin)
July 18, 2012 Filing 146 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Samsung Electronics America Inc filed by defendant Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Dismissal without Prejudice)(Snyder, Darin)
July 17, 2012 Filing 145 Joint STIPULATION to AMEND filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 17, 2012 Filing 144 Amendment to MOTION to Sever Motorola Mobility LLC and Dismiss or, In the Alternative, to Transfer 136 New Hearing Date: August 20, 2012 at 1:30 pm filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Sever, # 2 Declaration of Ann Deardorff In Support of Motion to Sever, # 3 Declaration of Kevin James In Support of Motion to Sever, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Proposed Order Alternate)(Taillieu, Olivier)
July 16, 2012 Filing 143 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever Claims and Transfer Venue filed by defendant Amazon.com Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/13/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Sever, # 2 Declaration of David Zapolsky in Support of Motion to Sever, # 3 Declaration of Robert T. Cruzen in Support of Motion to Sever, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Robert T. Cruzen, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Robert T. Cruzen, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Robert T. Cruzen, # 7 Proposed Order)(Cruzen, Robert)
July 16, 2012 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Golden Bridge Technology Inc, re Answer to Counterclaim 141 (AMENDED) served on 7/16/2012. (Hadley, Lawrence)
July 16, 2012 Filing 141 REPLY ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim 81 .(Hadley, Lawrence)
July 14, 2012 Filing 140 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant HTC BVI Corp acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/25/2012, answer due 8/24/2012; HTC Corp acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/25/2012, answer due 8/24/2012. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Martin R. Bader, Attorney. (Hadley, Lawrence)
July 14, 2012 Filing 139 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Research In Motion Limited acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/22/2012, answer due 8/21/2012. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Jonathan Lange, Attorney. (Hadley, Lawrence)
July 14, 2012 Filing 138 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Pantech Co., Ltd. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/22/2012, answer due 8/21/2012. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Alan A. Wright, Attorney. (Hadley, Lawrence)
July 11, 2012 Filing 137 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND; and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendant Amazon.com Inc.(lc)
July 11, 2012 Filing 136 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever Motorola Mobility LLC and Dismiss or, In the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/13/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Sever, # 2 Declaration of Ann Deardorff In Support of Motion to Sever, # 3 Declaration of Kevin James In Support of Motion to Sever, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Proposed Order Alternate)(Taillieu, Olivier)
July 11, 2012 Filing 135 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc, (Cruzen, Robert)
July 11, 2012 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy D Byron on behalf of Counter Claimants Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Defendants Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Byron, Timothy)
July 6, 2012 Filing 133 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND, and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendants Sierra Wireless Inc, Sierra Wireless America Inc.(lc) (lc).
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Amended Complaint 131 , for the following reasons: Counsel must submit an order asking the Court's permission to file a First Amended Complaint. (lc)
July 6, 2012 Filing 131 (STRICKEN PER 7/6/12 ORDER; NO ORDER OF COURT PERMITTING FILING )FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Amazon.com Inc, Apple Inc, Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com Inc, Dell Inc, Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC BVI Corp, HTC Corp, Hewlett-Packard Company, LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc, LG Electronics USA Inc, Lenovo Group Ltd, Lenovo Holding Company Inc, Lenovo United States Inc, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Palm Inc, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless Inc, Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sierra Wireless America Inc, Sierra Wireless Inc, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc, Sony Kabushiki Kaisha, ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc, ZTE USA Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery),Jury Demand 1 ,filed by plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc (lc) Modified on 7/9/2012 (lc). Modified on 7/9/2012 (lc).
July 6, 2012 Filing 128 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Sierra Wireless America Inc, Sierra Wireless Inc of Sierra Wireless Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.'s Complaint - Demand for Jury Trial. (Lopez, Ronald)
July 6, 2012 Filing 126 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Dell Notice (Other) 110 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice: Manual filing (G-92). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 6, 2012 Filing 125 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 93 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. pdf is not the G-92 form, but the answer and counteclaim. Clerk NOTES: The Notice of manual filing with correct pdf attachment was efiled correctly as #96 ; and the answer and counterclaim were Manually filed correctly and pdf was attached by clerk as # 116. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 6, 2012 Filing 124 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Leslie Neeland Harvey counsel for Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company. Changing address and firm name to Covington & Burling LLP, One Front Street, San Francisco, CA 94111. Changing email and fax number to mmarkman@cov.com 415.591.6091. Adding Michael M. Markman as attorney as counsel of record for Hewlett-Packard for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Hewlett-Packard (Harvey, Leslie)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Sierra Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 112 , for the following reasons: includes a counterclaim, an initiating document;Per G.O. 10-07, Attorneys are NOT TO E-FILE INITIATING DOCUMENTS, but to MANUALLY FILE IT WITH CIVIL INTAKE. AFTERWHICH, EMAIL WITHIN 24 HOURS the conformed filed stamped PDF image to :CivilIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lc)
July 6, 2012 Filing 120 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE:Sierra Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 112 . The following error(s) was found: pdf is combined answer and Counterclaim, an initiating document. Incorrect event and incorrect procedure selected. Per G.O. 10-07, Attorneys are NOT TO E-FILE INITIATING DOCUMENTS*, but to MANUALLY FILE IT WITH CIVIL INTAKE.In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 5, 2012 Filing 130 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc identifying Other Affiliate Sony Corporation for Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc. (lc) Modified on 7/6/2012 (lc). (lc).
July 5, 2012 Filing 129 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery 1 with JURY DEMAND, and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendants Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc.(lc) Modified on 7/6/2012 (lc). (lc).
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 103 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mitchell G. Stockwell on behalf of Motorolla Mobility, designating Olivier A. Taillieu as local counsel. (lt)
July 5, 2012 Filing 122 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND, and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendants Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC Corp, HTC BVI Corp.(lc)
July 5, 2012 Filing 121 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND, and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendants LG Electronics USA Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc.(lc)
July 5, 2012 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendants HTC America Inc, HTC Corp, HTC BVI Corp ,Exedea Inc,(lc) Modified on 7/6/2012 (lc).
July 5, 2012 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant and counterclaimant Dell Inc (lc)
July 5, 2012 Filing 117 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND, and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendant Dell Inc.(lc)
July 5, 2012 Filing 116 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND, and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendant Barnesandnoble.com Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC, Barnes and Noble Inc.(lc) (lc).
July 5, 2012 Filing 114 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND, and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendants Lenovo United States Inc, Lenovo Holding Company Inc.(lc) (lc).
July 5, 2012 Filing 113 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Sierra Wireless America Inc, Sierra Wireless Inc, (Lopez, Ronald)
July 5, 2012 Filing 112 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND SIERRA WIRELESS ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO GOLDEN BRIDGE TECHNOLOGY, INC.'S COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Sierra Wireless America Inc, Sierra Wireless Inc.(Lopez, Ronald) Modified on 7/6/2012 (lc). (STRICKEN PER 7/6/12 ORDER)
July 5, 2012 Filing 111 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC BVI Corp, HTC Corp of Answer and Counterclaims. (Korniczky, Stephen)
July 5, 2012 Filing 110 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Dell Inc. of Answer to Complaint for Patent Infringement and Counterclaims and Certification as to Interested Parties (Morando, James)
July 5, 2012 Filing 109 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Exedea Inc answer now due 7/5/2012; HTC America Inc answer now due 7/5/2012; HTC Corp answer now due 7/5/2012; HTC BVI Corp answer now due 7/5/2012, filed by Defendants Exedea Inc; HTC America Inc; HTC Corp; HTC BVI Corp.(Korniczky, Stephen)
July 5, 2012 Filing 108 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC. Amendment to Notice of Appearance 63 Amended Notice of Appearance of David Eiseman, IV on behalf of Defendants Barnes & Noble, Inc. and barnesandnoble.com llc (Eiseman, David)
July 5, 2012 Filing 107 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC. Amendment to Notice of Appearance 45 Amended Notice of Appearance of Brian James Dunne on behalf of Defendants Barnes & Noble, Inc. and barnesandnoble.com llc (Dunne, Brian)
July 5, 2012 Filing 106 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC BVI Corp, HTC Corp, identifying HTC Corp., HTC (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC America, Inc. and Exedea, Inc.. (Korniczky, Stephen)
July 5, 2012 Filing 105 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND,and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendants Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc.(lc) (lc).
July 5, 2012 Filing 104 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc, LG Electronics USA Inc of Defendants LG Electronics USA, Inc. and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.'s Answer to Complaint: Declaratory Judgment Counterclaims. (May, Olga)
July 5, 2012 Filing 103 APPLICATION for attorney Mitchell G. Stockwell to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10620814 paid.) filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A to Application, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Taillieu, Olivier)
July 5, 2012 Filing 102 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc., identifying Motorola Mobility LLC (formerly Motorola Mobility, Inc.) and Google, Inc.. (Taillieu, Olivier)
July 5, 2012 Filing 101 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Taillieu, Olivier)
July 5, 2012 Filing 100 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendants Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. filed by Defendants Lenovo Group Ltd, Lenovo Holding Company Inc, Lenovo United States Inc (Stein, David)
July 5, 2012 Filing 99 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC. Amendment to Amended Document (Non-Motion) 69 Certification as to Interested Parties (Eiseman, David)
July 5, 2012 Filing 98 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Lenovo Group Ltd, Lenovo Holding Company Inc, Lenovo United States Inc of Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims of Defendants Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. to Complaint for Infringement. (Stein, David)
July 5, 2012 Filing 97 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ZTE Solutions Inc, identifying ZTE Corporation. (Yang, Elizabeth)
July 5, 2012 Filing 96 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC of Barnes & Noble Inc.'s and Barnesandnoble.com LLC's Answer and Counterclaims and Demand for Jury Trial. (Dunne, Brian)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Barnes and Noble Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 89 (with a counerclaim, for the following reasons: wrong event and wrong procedure; Missing LR 7.1-1, Notice of interested parties.Per G.O. 10-07, Attorneys are NOT TO E-FILE INITIATING DOCUMENTS*, but to MANUALLY FILE IT WITH CIVIL INTAKE. AFTERWHICH, EMAIL WITHIN 24 HOURS the conformed filed stamped PDF image to :CivilIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov (lc)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Samsung Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 88 (with a counterclaim), for the following reasons: wrong event and wrong procedure.;Per G.O. 10-07, Attorneys are NOT TO E-FILE INITIATING DOCUMENTS*, but to MANUALLY FILE IT WITH CIVIL INTAKE. AFTERWHICH, EMAIL WITHIN 24 HOURS the conformed filed stamped PDF image to :CivilIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov (lc)
July 5, 2012 Filing 93 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC of Answer and Counterclaims; Demand for Jury Trial. (Dunne, Brian)
July 5, 2012 Filing 92 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Barnes and Nobles Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 89 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event and incorrect procedure selected. pdf is combined answer and initiating document, a Counterclaim. Per G.O. 10-07, Attorneys are NOT TO E-FILE INITIATING DOCUMENTS*, but to MANUALLY FILE IT WITH CIVIL INTAKE.Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 5, 2012 Filing 91 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: SAMSUNG Answer to Complaint (Discovery), 88 . The following error(s) was found: PDF is combined answer and Counterclaim, an initiating document.Incorrect event and incorrect procedure.Per G.O. 10-07, Attorneys are NOT TO E-FILE INITIATING DOCUMENTS*, but to MANUALLY FILE IT WITH CIVIL INTAKE. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 3, 2012 Filing 115 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND, and COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendant ZTE Solutions Inc.(lc) (lc).
July 3, 2012 Filing 90 DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.; SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC.; SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.; AND SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLCS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND ENTITIES PURSUANT TO L. R. 7.1-1 of Interested Parties (Snyder, Darin)
July 3, 2012 Filing 89 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC.(Eiseman, David) Modified on 7/5/2012 (lc). (STRICKEN PER 7/5/12 ORDER)
July 3, 2012 Filing 88 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.; SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC.; SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.; AND SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC TO GOLDEN BRIDGE TECHNOLOGY, INC.S COMPLAINT.(Snyder, Darin) Modified on 7/5/2012 (lc). (STRICKEN PER 7/5/12 ORDER)
June 29, 2012 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan Ken Yagura on behalf of Defendants Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Yagura, Ryan)
June 29, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nicholas Bruce Janda on behalf of Defendants Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Janda, Nicholas)
June 29, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Darin W Snyder on behalf of Defendants Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Snyder, Darin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lee Hsu on behalf of Defendants Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC BVI Corp, HTC Corp (Hsu, Lee)
June 28, 2012 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen S Korniczky on behalf of Defendants Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC BVI Corp, HTC Corp (Korniczky, Stephen)
June 27, 2012 Filing 82 Golden Bridge Technology ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim 65 filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
June 22, 2012 Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendant Apple Inc.(lc) (lc).
June 22, 2012 Filing 80 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Apple Inc, identifying Apple Inc.. (Teter, Timothy)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER SUBSTITUTING PANTECH CO., LTD. FOR PANTECH CORP 77 by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (lc)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 76 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric J. Klein on behalf of Defendant Lenovo United States Inc., designating David Stein as local counsel. (lt)
June 12, 2012 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to CORRECT THE PANTECH ENTITIES filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hadley, Lawrence)
June 11, 2012 Filing 76 APPLICATION for attorney Eric Joseph Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10504510 paid.) filed by Defendant Lenovo United States Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stein, David)
June 9, 2012 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, re Order, Set/Reset Hearing,, 74 served on June 8, 2012. (Hadley, Lawrence)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2012 at 01:30 PM; compliance with FRCP 26(f) and filing of report and other instructions. Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 72 Motion to Substitute Party. Motorola Mobility, Inc. is substituted for Motorola, Inc,the style of the case is revised accordingly, and all prior pleadingsmotions, answers, and/or other filed documents in this case reflecting Motorola, Inc. shall be deemed to now say Motorola Mobility, Inc. instead. (lc)
June 6, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. for Defendant Motorola, Inc. filed by Defendant Motorola Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Steiner, Elham)
June 6, 2012 Filing 71 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Exedea Inc answer now due 7/3/2012; HTC America Inc answer now due 7/3/2012; HTC Corp answer now due 7/3/2012; HTC BVI Corp answer now due 7/3/2012, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Plaintiff Exedea Inc; Golden Bridge Technology Inc; HTC America Inc; HTC Corp; HTC BVI Corp.(Hadley, Lawrence)
June 5, 2012 Filing 70 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pantech Wireless Inc answer now due 7/6/2012, filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
June 5, 2012 Filing 69 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC. Amendment to Corporate Disclosure Statement 47 (Dunne, Brian)
June 5, 2012 Filing 68 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 5, 2012 re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Sierra Wireless America Inc.(Lopez, Ronald)
June 5, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 59 , Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) 60 . The following error(s) was found: pdfs are NOT answers, but stipulations to extend time to answer. Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Stipulation to extend time to answer 30 days or less; or 30 days or more (which requires a proposed order be submitted as separate attachment. Note: # 56 has been ruled on. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
June 5, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Eiseman, IV on behalf of Defendants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC (Eiseman, David)
June 5, 2012 Filing 62 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to LG Electronics USA Inc answer now due 7/5/2012; LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc answer now due 7/5/2012, filed by Defendants LG Electronics USA Inc; LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc.(May, Olga)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Pursuant to the stipulation 56 between Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.and Defendants Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC the due date forDefendants to file a response to the Complaint is extended to and including July 3, 2012 by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
June 5, 2012 Filing 60 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com Inc answer now due 7/11/2012, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc.(Cruzen, Robert)
June 4, 2012 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Hewlett-Packard Company, (lc) (lc).
June 4, 2012 Filing 66 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company, upon Defendant Golden Bridge Technology Inc served on 6/4/2012, answer due 6/25/2012. Service of the answer and Counterclaim were executed upon counter defendant in compliance with statute not specified by service by mail. (lc) (lc).
June 4, 2012 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bridge Technology Inc filed by defendant Hewlett-Packard Company.(lc) (lc).
June 4, 2012 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) by MOTOROLA, INC. filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
June 4, 2012 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING 50 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint for Defendants HTC Corp., HTC (B.V.I.) Corp., HTC American, Inc. and Exedea by Judge Otis D Wright II. DENIED by Order of the Court. (sch) Modified on 6/4/2012 (sch).
June 4, 2012 Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hadley, Lawrence)
June 4, 2012 Filing 54 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to ZTE Solutions Inc answer now due 7/3/2012; ZTE USA Inc answer now due 7/3/2012, filed by Defendants ZTE Solutions Inc; ZTE USA Inc.(Miller, Scott)
June 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer 49 by Judge Otis D Wright II. DENIED By Order of the Court. (sch)
June 2, 2012 Filing 53 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sony Corporation of America answer now due 7/5/2012; Sony Electronics Inc answer now due 7/5/2012, filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
June 2, 2012 Filing 52 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Lenovo Group Ltd answer now due 7/5/2012; Lenovo Holding Company Inc answer now due 7/5/2012; Lenovo United States Inc answer now due 7/5/2012, filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
June 2, 2012 Filing 51 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Motorola Inc answer now due 7/5/2012, filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc.(Hadley, Lawrence)
June 2, 2012 Filing 50 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 3, 2012 filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hadley, Lawrence)
June 2, 2012 Filing 49 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 3, 2012 filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hadley, Lawrence)
June 1, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Elizabeth Yang counsel for Defendants ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc, ZTE USA Inc. Adding Elizabeth Yang as attorney as counsel of record for ZTE Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants ZTE Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. (Yang, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2012 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC identifying Barnes & Noble, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Dunne, Brian)
June 1, 2012 Filing 46 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Barnesandnoble.com Inc answer now due 7/3/2012; Barnesandnoble.com LLC answer now due 7/3/2012; Barnes and Noble Inc answer now due 7/3/2012, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendants Barnesandnoble.com Inc; Barnesandnoble.com LLC; Barnes and Noble Inc.(Dunne, Brian)
June 1, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brian James Dunne on behalf of Defendants Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC (Dunne, Brian)
June 1, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David M Stein on behalf of Defendant Lenovo United States Inc (Stein, David)
June 1, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Scott R Miller counsel for Defendants ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc, ZTE USA Inc. Adding Scott R. Miller as attorney as counsel of record for ZTE Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants ZTE Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. (Miller, Scott)
May 31, 2012 Filing 42 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Apple Inc answer now due 6/22/2012, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Apple Inc.(Mead, Lowell)
May 31, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lowell D Mead on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc (Mead, Lowell)
May 31, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy S Teter on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc (Teter, Timothy)
May 30, 2012 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant HTC America Inc served on 5/16/2012, answer due 6/6/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Priscilla Cardenas, Process Specialist, National Registered Agents in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PATENT STANDING ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II. UNLESS OTHERWISE ORDERED BY THE COURT, THE FOLLOWING RULES APPLY TO ALL PATENT CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE OTIS D. WRIGHT, II. WHERE THESE RULES CONFLICT WITH RULES PROMULGATED ELSEWHERE, THIS DOCUMENT CONTROLS. (See Order for details.) (kti)
May 29, 2012 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant ZTE Solutions Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Matthews, Process Specialist, Corporation Service Company, Statutory Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant ZTE USA Inc served on 5/16/2012, answer due 6/6/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rand Effron, Office Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant ZTE Corporation served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Loril Li, Human Resources Manager Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Sony Electronics Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Matthews, Process Specialist, Corporation Service Company, Statutory Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Sony Corporation of America served on 5/15/2012, answer due 6/5/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Sierra Wireless America Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Connie Norton, Agent Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Matthews, Process Specialist, Corporation Service Company, Statutory Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Samsung Electronics America Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Aixa Flores, Process Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Samsung Semiconductor Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Meagan Seymour, Process Specialist, National Registered Agents in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Research In Motion Corporation served on 5/14/2012, answer due 8/3/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Lascala, Process Specialist, The Corporation Trust Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Pantech Wireless Inc, upon Defendant Pantech Wireless Inc served on 5/16/2012, answer due 6/6/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kathy Jones, Agent Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Lenovo United States Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Lascala, Process Specialist, The Corporation Trust Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Lenovo Holding Company Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Lascala, Process Specialist, The Corporation Trust Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leslie Lofton, Manager of Operations Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant LG Electronics USA Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Matthews, Process Specialist, Corporation Service Company, Statutory Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/13/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. `, PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/13/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Lascala, Process Specialist, The Corporation Trust Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Dell Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 7/5/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Matthews, Process Specialist, Corporaiton Service Company, Statutory Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Barnesandnoble.com LLC served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dee Embry, Agent Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Barnesandnoble.com Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dee Embry, AGent Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Barnes and Noble Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dee Embry, Agent Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Motorola Inc served on 5/14/2012, answer due 6/4/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Lascala, Process Specialist, The Corporation Trust Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Amazon.com Inc served on 5/21/2012, answer due 6/11/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ashley Mcauliffe, Process Specialist, Corporation Service Company, Statutory Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint 12 by Judge Otis D Wright II. Pursuant to the stipulation between Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology, Inc. and Defendant Dell Inc., the due date for Defendant Dell Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including July 5, 2012. (sch)
May 26, 2012 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc, upon Defendant Apple Inc served on 5/11/2012, answer due 6/1/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Margaret Wilson, Process Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proofs of Service)(Hadley, Lawrence)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Case transferred from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Otis D Wright, II for all further proceedings. Case number now reads CV 12-04014 ODW(FFMx). (rn)
May 25, 2012 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 3, 2012 re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Dell Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Roderick)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint 10 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Pursuant to the stipulation between Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology, Inc. and Defendants Research In Motion Limited and Research In Motion Corporation, the due date for Defendants Research In Motion Limited and Research In Motion Corporation to file a response to the Complaint is extended to and including August 3, 2012. (sch)
May 21, 2012 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 3, 2012 re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lange, Jonathan)
May 17, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) 8 was issued in error, notice of dismissal docket entry # 7 was only as to 2 defendants, Sony Mobile Communications AB,Sony Mobile Communications USA Inc ONLY. Case still pending. (lc)
May 16, 2012 Filing 8 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 notice of dismissal) (lc)
May 16, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Sony Mobile Communications AB, Sony Mobile Communications USA Inc. (Hadley, Lawrence)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 08-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 12-04014 DDP(FFMx). (rn)
May 10, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL by Judge Christina A. Snyder: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder. Counsel are advised that the Court expects strict compliance with the provisions of the Local Rules and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See document for details. (gk)
May 8, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 8, 2012 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (et)
May 8, 2012 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (et) (jp).
May 8, 2012 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Apple Inc, Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC, Dell Inc, Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC BVI Corp, HTC Corp, Hewlett-Packard Company, LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc, LG Electronics USA Inc, Lenovo Group Ltd, Lenovo Holding Company Inc, Lenovo United States Inc, Motorola Inc, Palm Inc, Pantech Corp, Pantech Wireless Inc, Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sierra Wireless America Inc, Sierra Wireless Inc, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc, Sony Kabushiki Kaisha, Sony Mobile Communications AB, Sony Mobile Communications USA Inc, ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc, ZTE USA Inc. (et)
May 8, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Apple Inc, Barnes and Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC, Dell Inc, Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC BVI Corp, HTC Corp, Hewlett-Packard Company, LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc, LG Electronics USA Inc, Lenovo Group Ltd, Lenovo Holding Company Inc, Lenovo United States Inc, Motorola Inc, Palm Inc, Pantech Corp, Pantech Wireless Inc, Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sierra Wireless America Inc, Sierra Wireless Inc, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc, Sony Kabushiki Kaisha, Sony Mobile Communications AB, Sony Mobile Communications USA Inc, ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc, ZTE USA Inc. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Golden Bridge Technology Inc. (et) (jp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Bridge Technology Inc v. Apple Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Bridge Technology Inc
Represented By: Roderick G. Dorman
Represented By: Lawrence M. Hadley
Represented By: Jeanne E Irving
Represented By: Mieke K Malmberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Lowell D. Mead
Represented By: Timothy S Teter
Represented By: Timothy S. Teter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?