Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lion Capital Mangement, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Lion Capital Mangement, LLC and Hausmann-Alain Banet
Case Number: 5:2012cv05116
Filed: October 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 INJUNCTION by Judge William Alsup [granting 28 Motion for Default Judgment]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/23/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/28/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/21/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER STAYING CASE. Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/24/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lion Capital Mangement, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Sahil Wesley Desai
Represented By: Michael S. Dicke
Represented By: John Scott Yun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Capital Mangement, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hausmann-Alain Banet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?