Bakhtiari Corporation et al v. Register Tapes Unlimited, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bakhtiari Corporation, Bakhtiari, LLC, California Automotive Group, Inc. and York Enterprises South, Inc.
Defendant: Register Tapes Unlimited, Inc., Avenue Advertising and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 5:2012cv05183
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REQUESTING STATUS. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 11/19/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement or Stipulation of Dismissal due by 7/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/19/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 43 Motion to Compel; granting 47 Motion to Compel (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re 60 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/19/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE 31 LETTER BRIEF. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 10, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/13/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/09/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Stipulation to Add Defendant.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakhtiari Corporation et al v. Register Tapes Unlimited, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bakhtiari Corporation
Represented By: Michael Kelly Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bakhtiari, LLC
Represented By: Michael Kelly Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Kelly Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: York Enterprises South, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Kelly Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Register Tapes Unlimited, Inc.
Represented By: David John Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avenue Advertising
Represented By: David John Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?