Lofstrom et al v. Miasole
Plaintiff: Michael Lofstrom, Chris Barber, Edward J. McInerney and Erica Siu
Defendant: Miasole
Case Number: 5:2012cv05184
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 13, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO VACATE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 3, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MIASOLE, INC.'S NOTICE WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 14, 2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lofstrom et al v. Miasole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lofstrom
Represented By: Chad A. Saunders
Represented By: Chad A. Saunders
Represented By: Arthur W Lazear
Represented By: H. Tim Hoffman
Represented By: Eric Barba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Barber
Represented By: Eric Barba
Represented By: H. Tim Hoffman
Represented By: Arthur W Lazear
Represented By: Chad A. Saunders
Represented By: Chad A. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. McInerney
Represented By: Eric Barba
Represented By: H. Tim Hoffman
Represented By: Arthur W Lazear
Represented By: Chad A. Saunders
Represented By: Chad A. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Siu
Represented By: Eric Barba
Represented By: H. Tim Hoffman
Represented By: Arthur W Lazear
Represented By: Chad A. Saunders
Represented By: Chad A. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miasole
Represented By: Allen M. Kato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?