Patterson Vegetable Company, LLC v. Superior Foods Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patterson Vegetable Company, LLC
Defendant: Superior Foods Inc., David E. Moore, Monroe Howser and Lewis M. Lettunich
Case Number: 5:2012cv05286
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND GRANTING 46 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 29, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 34 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh finding as moot 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 21 Stipulation (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 8 Ex Parte Application ; denying 8 Motion for TRO.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson Vegetable Company, LLC v. Superior Foods Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patterson Vegetable Company, LLC
Represented By: Marcus Don Magness
Represented By: David Malcolm Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe Howser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis M. Lettunich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?