Lou v. MA Laboratories, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Lou
Defendant: MA Laboratories, Inc, Abraham Ma, Christine Rao and Christy Yee
Case Number: 5:2012cv05409
Filed: October 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 481 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING OPT -INS SSUCHIA CHEN, BERTHA DE LA MADRID NICKEL, XUEOU FENG, ROGER SERMONE, EMI SHIGEMITSU AND CHIA CHI YI by Hon. William Alsup granting 477 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying 222 Motion for Sanctions (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER PERMITTING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE JANUARY 8 ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 18, 2014. Response due March 24. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 452) by Hon. William Alsup denying 452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 453 Order Releasing Transcript of Settlement Stipulation to Counsel for Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/13/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION AND SETTING HEARING FOR MARCH 14 AT 9:00 A.M. re 446 MOTION to Shorten Time on Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Temporarily Enjoining Enforcement of Non-Final Settlement Agr eement filed by Michelle Lou Responses due by noon on 3/13/2014. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 12, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 426 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER REGARDING FEBRUARY 27 HEARING re 435 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed by MA Laboratories, Inc, Christy Yee, Christine Rao, Abr aham Ma, 434 Order, 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed by Christy Yee, 432 Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 24, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 19, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION WITHDRAWING DISCOVERY LETTER REGARDING EMAILS AND EPOPS 428 . The hearing re discovery letter 418 set for 1/29/2014 01:00 PM is VACATED. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/28/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 420 OMNIBUS ORDER RE CERTIFICATION AND RELATED MOTIONS by Judge Alsup finding as moot 351 Motion <Class Action Denied>; finding as moot 352 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. ; denying 272 Motion to Certify Class; finding as moot 284 Motion <Class Action Denied>; finding as moot 295 Motion <Class Action Denied> (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID W. SANFORD PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 415 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER RE TIAN ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 26, 2013. Plaintiffs' response due December 30 at noon. Defendants' response due December 31 at noon. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 5, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 383 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER by Hon. William Alsup denying 376 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE by Hon. William Alsup denying 346 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 287 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS by Hon. William Alsup denying 265 Motion to Shorten Time.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER RE SCHEDULING by Hon. William Alsup granting 261 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 251 Motion to Shorten Time; denying 252 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER RESOLVING VARIOUS DISCOVERY DISPUTES (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY MEET AND CONFER - Discovery Hearing set for 9/20/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/16/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Order re: August 21, 2013 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/20/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Order Granting 210 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/12/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER DISMISSING COUNTERCLAIMS, GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER, DENYING RECONSIDERATION, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 149 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 159 Motion to Strike ; denying 174 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 193 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE ON PENDING MOTIONS re 174 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order filed by MA Laboratories, Inc, 193 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Michelle Lou, [1 49] MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Complaint and Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint filed by Michelle Lou, 159 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Michelle Lou. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 12, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Order re 167 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 06/26/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION RE XUEOU FENG by Judge William Alsup [denying 69 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION RE MICHELLE LOU by Judge William Alsup [denying 31 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING MODIFICATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Hon. William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER RE MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge William Alsup [granting 124 Motion to Shorten Time]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013) Modified on 5/7/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup granting 57 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING 75 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by MA Laboratories, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/15/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 61 Plaintiffs' request to compel discovery. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES ON PENDING ARBITRATION MOTION AND FOR ORDER COMBINING BRIEFING ON ARBITRATION MOTIONS AND EXTENDING RELATED DEADLINES filed by Michelle Lou, Motions terminated: 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES ON PENDING ARBITRATION MOTION AND FOR ORDER COMBINING BRIEFING ON ARBITRATION MOTIONS AND EXTENDING RELATED DEADLINES filed by M ichelle Lou., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES ON PENDING ARBITRATION MOTION AND FOR ORDER COMBINING BRIEFING ON ARBITRATION MOTIONS AND EXTENDING RELATED DEADLINES, 31 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action Pending Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Responses due by 4/11/2013. Replies due by 4/29/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 26, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting Plaintiff's requests for discovery re: 48 Discovery Letter Brief. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 42 Discovery Letter Brief Number 1 filed by Michelle Lou, 43 Discovery Letter Brief Number 2 filed by Michelle Lou, 44 Discovery Letter Brief Number 3 filed by Michelle Lou, 45 Discovery Letter Br ief Number 4 filed by Michelle Lou, 46 Discovery Letter Brief (Defendants' Request to Strike Plaintiff's Discovery Letter Briefs 1-4) filed by MA Laboratories, Inc, Christy Yee, Christine Rao, Abraham Ma. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 03/05/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REFERRING ALL DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO A RANDOMLY-ASSIGNEDMAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Alsup granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action Pending Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ; denying 38 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 39 Motion for Leave to File Responses due by 3/28/2013. Replies due by 4/4/2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY re 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Michelle Lou (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Christy Yee, Christine Rao, Abraham Ma]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/3/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lou v. MA Laboratories, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Lou
Represented By: Janette L Wipper
Represented By: Xinying Valerian
Represented By: Andrew Melzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MA Laboratories, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Rao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?