Sanchez v. Aerogroup Retail Holdings, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Sanchez
Defendant: Aerogroup Retail Holdings, Inc and Does 1-50
Case Number: 5:2012cv05445
Filed: October 22, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 73 Motion ; granting 74 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Clerk shall close the file. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order Continuing Case Management Conference; Construing Motion as a Motion for Preliminary Approval; and Vacating Pre-Trial and Trial Dates. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/5/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RE PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/5/2013. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 46 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 14 Motion to Remand (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 35 Brief filed by Jessica Sanchez. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/23/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 29 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 23 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 7 MOTION to Dismiss .(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Aerogroup Retail Holdings, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Sanchez
Represented By: Scott Allen Miller
Represented By: Bonnie Fong
Represented By: Kelly Ann Buschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerogroup Retail Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Sarah Diane Youngblood
Represented By: William John Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?