Flores v. GC Services, LP.
Plaintiff: Miroslava Flores
Defendant: GC Services, LP.
Case Number: 5:2012cv05484
Filed: October 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/03/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/03/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/16/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 19 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/20/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/9/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. GC Services, LP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miroslava Flores
Represented By: Ryan Scott Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Services, LP.
Represented By: David Ian Dalby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?