Pasquale v. I.C. System, Inc
Plaintiff: Eugene Pasquale
Defendant: I.C. System, Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv05539
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing case with prejudice. Each party to bear their own costs and fees. The clerk shall close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on July 31, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER CONTINUING SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing continued to 8/6/2013 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on June 27, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Hearing continued to 7/2/2013 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/25/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. LLoyd on May 22, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/28/2013 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/21/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on April 22, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the fact discovery to May 1, 2013 for the sole purpose of allowing each of the parties to conduct one deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on March 18, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Continuing the Early Neutral Evaluation Deadline to April 15, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on March 5, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/29/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE ENE EVALUATION DEADLINE TO MARCH 15, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on January 28, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER authorizing substitution of attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on November 27, 2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pasquale v. I.C. System, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Pasquale
Represented By: Suren N. Weerasuriya
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C. System, Inc
Represented By: Sean P Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?