Howard v. First Horizon Home Loan Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Patrick D Howard
Defendant: First Horizon Home Loan Corporation, Metlife Home Loans, LLC, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. and The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Case Number: 5:2012cv05735
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER APPROVING 117 STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court shall close the case file. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 1/30/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Final Pretrial Conference remains set for 2/19/2015 at 02:30 PM. Trial remains scheduled to begin March 30, 2015. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 12/9/2014. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2014 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2014. Last Day to Disclose Experts 12/15/2014. Fact Disovery Cut-Off 12/15/2014. Expert Discovery Cut-Off 01/15/2015. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 1/22/2015 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2015 02:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 3/30/2015 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2015 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 06/09/2014. All hearings set before Judge Beth Labson Freeman, Courtroom #3, 5th Floor. U.S. District Court 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113.(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/8/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. The parties are encouraged to submit a supplemental Joint Case Management Statement by May 29, 2014 with proposals for a discovery plan and pretrial schedule. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/7/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Joint Stipulation to Extend Mediation Completion Date and Continue Case Management Conference filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage, L LC., First Horizon Home Loan Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 26, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation for Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint to Stand as Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, First Horizon Home Loan Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Dismiss; denying 69 MOTION to Strike Portions of Second Amended Complaint. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 69 MOTION to Strike filed by Metlife Home Loans, LLC, 67 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Metlife Home Loans, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 14, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Dismiss; granting 49 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 49 MOTION to Strike filed by Metlife Home Loans, LLC, 48 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Metlife Home Loans, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 10, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Proposed Order re 37 JOINT STIPULATION TO FURTHER CONTINUE DEFENDANT METLIFE BANKS RESPONSE DEADLINE TO PLAINTIFF PATRICK HOWARDS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Response Deadline due by 2/28/2013. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/8/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING METLIFE HOME LOANS, LLCS UNOPPOSED ( 9 , 11 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/27/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Claudia Wilken. Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/21/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. First Horizon Home Loan Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick D Howard
Represented By: Elena Rivkin Franz
Represented By: John Louis Mlnarik
Represented By: Caroline Mary Reebs
Represented By: James Justin Steinle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Horizon Home Loan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Home Loans, LLC
Represented By: Carleton R. Burch
Represented By: Emily S Fung
Represented By: Jesse Stuart Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?