Palmer v. Palisades Collections, LLC
Plaintiff: Bruce Palmer
Defendant: Palisades Collections, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv05751
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 16 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Suggesting Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/01/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 11 Stipulation filed by Palisades Collections, LLC Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/02/13. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Palisades Collections, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Palmer
Represented By: Tammy Hussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palisades Collections, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?