J&J Sports Production, Inc v. Castro et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Production, Inc
Defendant: Enrique Serrano Castro, Rosalinda Reynoso and Daniel Avila Tule
Case Number: 5:2012cv05767
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 553 Communications Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 WRIT of EXECUTION issued in the amount of $4953.67. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 33 Motion for Default Judgment (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Directing Parties to File a Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 13, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 17 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 25, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/20/2013 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 3/13/2013.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/06/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/04/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Production, Inc v. Castro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Production, Inc
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Serrano Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalinda Reynoso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Avila Tule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?