J&J Sports Production, Inc v. Vizcarra
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Production, Inc
Defendant: Onofre Vizcarra
Case Number: 5:2012cv05770
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553 Communications Act of 1994
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER 23 of Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/24/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER 15 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/21/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER 11 to Continue the Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/13/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Production, Inc v. Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Production, Inc
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onofre Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?