Aetna Life Insurance Company v. Bay Area Surgical Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Bobby Sarnevesht, Julia Hashemieh, Pacific Heights Surgery Center, Bay Area Surgical Management, LLC, Bay Area Surgical Group, Inc., Forest Surgery Center, Soar Surgery Center LLC, Knowles Surgery Center, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP and Javad Zolfaghari
Case Number: 5:2012cv05829
Filed: November 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 29:1002 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER AMENDING 33 ORDER on 10 MOTION to Remand (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 10 Motion to Remand (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER 6 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/21/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aetna Life Insurance Company v. Bay Area Surgical Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Sarnevesht
Represented By: Katherine Mandalay Markowski
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Hashemieh
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Katherine Mandalay Markowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Heights Surgery Center
Represented By: James A. Lassart
Represented By: Jaemin Chang
Represented By: Adrian G. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Surgical Management, LLC
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Katherine Mandalay Markowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Surgical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Katherine Mandalay Markowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Surgery Center
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Katherine Mandalay Markowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soar Surgery Center LLC
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Katherine Mandalay Markowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knowles Surgery Center
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Katherine Mandalay Markowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Ambulatory Surgery Center
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Katherine Mandalay Markowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Altos Surgery Center, LP
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Katherine Mandalay Markowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javad Zolfaghari
Represented By: Katherine Mandalay Markowski
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher T. Heffelfinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?