Riccardi v. Lynch et al
Plaintiff: Philip Riccardi
Defendant: Michael R Lynch, Leo Apotheker, Margaret C. Whitman, Catherine A. Lesjak, G. Kennedy Thompson, Shumeet Banerji, Gary M Reiner, John H. Hammergren, Marc L Andreessen, Raymond J. Lane, Patricia F Russo, Ann M Livermore, Ralph V Whitworth, Shane V. Robison, Lawrence T. Babbio, Jr., Sari M. Baldauf, Dominique Senequier, Deloitte LLP, KPMG LLP, Perella Weinberg Partners UK LLP, Barclays Capital and Hewlett-Packard Company
Case Number: 5:2012cv06003
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Order Adopting Special Master's Report and Recommendation by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting user PACER exemption. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/3/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER FOR REVIEW OF SEALING REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 08/17/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER FOR REVIEW OF SEALING REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 08/10/215. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 365 Motion for Settlement (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 367 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 380 Administrative Motion to Fi le Under Seal; denying 390 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 398 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 401 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER as modified 334 STIPULATION re 333 MOTION to Intervene [NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION AND RENEWED MOTION TO INTERVENE Stipulation to file response brief on May 6, 2015 filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 333 MOTION to Intervene [NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION AND RENEWED MOTION TO INTERVENE. Responses due by 4/29/2015. Replies due by 5/6/2015. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/27/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER Re Pending Motions by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Demand Refused Plaintiffs' motion 271 need not be resolved prior to the final approval hearing. Shareholder Copeland's motion 307 is moot. This Court recommends that Sushovan Hussain's motion 308 be resolved prior to the final approval hearing.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Discovery in Connection with the Third Amended and Restated Stipulation of Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting as modified 330 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER On Shareholder Copeland's Motion to Shorten Time by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: denying 321 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER Re Discovery Procedures by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 277 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; finding as moot 286 Ex Parte Application; finding as moot 309 Motion to Shorten Time; granting 150 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 269 Motion to Intervene; denying 276 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER denying 267 Motion to Vacate (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER re withdrawal of motions to seal. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/19/2014. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 155 STIPULATION re: Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Derivative Settlement filed by Stanley Morrical. Reset Hearing as to 149 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval of D erivative Settlement). Motion for Preliminary Approval Hearing reset for 8/25/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/16/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER re 97 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Attorney Darryl Paul Rains; Mark R.S. Foster and Judson Earle Lobdell terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/1/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re 92 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, Attorney Darryl Paul Rains,Judson Earle Lobdell for Hewlett-Packard Company added. Attorney Robert E. Gooding, Jr; Kimberly Alexander Kane; Karen A. Pieslak Pohlmann; Marc J. Sonnenfeld; Matthew S. Weiler; Jennifer Renee Bagosy and Joseph Edward Floren terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/19/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER UNSEALING COMPLAINT IN PART AND REQUIRING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 05/20/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riccardi v. Lynch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Riccardi
Represented By: Felipe Javier Arroyo
Represented By: Kevin S. Kim
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Apotheker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret C. Whitman
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Kaban
Represented By: Stephen Cassidy Neal
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Lesjak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Kennedy Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shumeet Banerji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary M Reiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Hammergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L Andreessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond J. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia F Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann M Livermore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph V Whitworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane V. Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence T. Babbio, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sari M. Baldauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Senequier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPMG LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perella Weinberg Partners UK LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Represented By: Kimberly Alexander Kane
Represented By: Karen A. Pieslak Pohlmann
Represented By: Marc J. Sonnenfeld
Represented By: Matthew S. Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?