Keefauver v. Bank of America, National Association
Plaintiff: Lawrence Keefauver
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Case Number: 5:2012cv06080
Filed: November 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 45 plaintiff's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order; finding as moot 55 defendant's Motion to Appear by Telephone. 11/12/2013 hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 43 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/10/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 37 stipulated request to permit amendment to name FIA Card Services, N.A. as defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/30/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying as moot 23 Bank of America's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 35 Parties' Second Stipulated Request to Extend Scheduling Deadlines. Fact discovery cutoff: 9/27/2013. Designation of experts with reports: 10/15/2013. Designation of rebuttal experts with reports: 10/28/2013. Expert discovery cutoff: 11/25/2013. Last day for hearing on dispositive motions: 1/28/2014, 10:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2014, 1:30 PM. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving 6 Substitution of Counsel for Bank of America, N.A. Raagini Shah of Reed Smith LLC substituted in place of Charles W. Nunley of Malcom Cisneros, a Law Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/4/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keefauver v. Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Keefauver
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: William Guy Malcolm
Represented By: Abraham Joshua Colman
Represented By: Raagini Rashmi Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?