Morris v. Sandoval et al
Plaintiff: Condalee Morris
Defendant: D. Sandoval, W. Blair, J. Huff, Espinosa, Myers, D. Nunley and M. Rose
Case Number: 5:2012cv06132
Filed: December 3, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 262 Ex Parte Application ; denying 264 Motion for Reconsideration. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 253 Motion for Reconsideration. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/22/2017. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 214 Motion RELIEF FROM FINAL JUDGMENT; granting 216 Motion for Protective Order; denying 221 Motion RELIEF FROM FINAL JUDGMENT. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Matter not settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/20/2016. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/11/2015. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 188 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 189 Motion for Settlement; denying 190 Motion to Compel (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 169 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 172 Motion (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/15/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 4/8/2015. (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 12/2/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 10/06/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 09/30/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO RE-OPEN. Plaintiff's amended complaint was filed on May 10, 2013, by was docketed after the Curt's order of dismissal was filed. Although the amended complaint is late, the Court exercises is discretion to VACATE the judgment and REOPEN this action. The Court will conduct its initial screening in a separate order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/7/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Sandoval et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Condalee Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Nunley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?