Bell v. Standard Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Bell
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company and california Teachers Association Economics Benefit Trust
Case Number: 5:2012cv06344
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1002 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 22 Stipulation of Dismissal.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONFIRMING DISMISSAL OF CALIFORNIA TEACHERS ASSOCIATION ECONOMICS BENEFIT TRUST AND GRANTING THE PARTIES FEBRUARY 11, 2013 STIPULATION 12 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 11, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 15 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Standard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Bell
Represented By: Melvyn David Silver
Represented By: Ruth A. Silver-Taube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Allison Anne Vana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: california Teachers Association Economics Benefit Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?