Cardinalli v. Superior Court of California for the County of Monterey et al
Plaintiff: Sal J Cardinalli
Defendant: Yellow Cab Company of Monterey County, LLC, The United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of California, The Stephen P. Cardinall and Francesca Cardinalli Living Trust, Vincent Cardinalli, Yellow Cab, Salinas Yellow Cab, Salinas Yellow Cab Co, LLC, The John P. Cardinalli, Jr. and Angela Cardinalli Living Trust, Michael Cardinalli, Monterey Airporter Yellow Cab, John T Cardinalli, III, Superior Court of California for the County of Monterey, John T Cardinalli, Jr., Stephen P Cardinalli and John T Cardinalli, Sr
Case Number: 5:2012cv06356
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/16/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/8/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 22 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Vacating Hearing and Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/1/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 11, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 21 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND FOR ORDER THAT CLERK ISSUE REQUESTED SUMMONS by Hon. Lucy H. Koh.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting 15 Stipulation (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardinalli v. Superior Court of California for the County of Monterey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellow Cab Company of Monterey County, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Stephen P. Cardinall and Francesca Cardinalli Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Cardinalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellow Cab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salinas Yellow Cab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salinas Yellow Cab Co, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The John P. Cardinalli, Jr. and Angela Cardinalli Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cardinalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Airporter Yellow Cab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T Cardinalli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of California for the County of Monterey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T Cardinalli, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen P Cardinalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T Cardinalli, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sal J Cardinalli
Represented By: Hugo N. Gerstl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?