B. v. San Jose Unified School District
Plaintiff: J. B.
Defendant: San Jose Unified School District
Case Number: 5:2012cv06358
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 6 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/2/13 is continued to 5/17/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/30/13., Motions terminated: 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference filed by San Jose Unified School District.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B. v. San Jose Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B.
Represented By: David Henry Tollner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Jose Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?