Gavra et al v. Google Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Diana Ramona Gavra, Cabinet de Avocat and Luris Civilis Association
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv06547
Filed: December 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2013 Filing 22 RESPONSE (re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byCabinet de Avocat, Diana Ramona Gavra, Luris Civilis Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Gavra, Diana) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 2, 2013 Filing 21 REPLY (re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 4/16/2013 MOTION TO DISMISS AND COURT TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (In Re: Docket No. 10 ) presently set for 4/16/2013 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal is hereby submitted without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). Accordingly, the 4/16/2013 hearing is vacated. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013) Modified on 3/29/2013 (ofr, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE by Google Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 28, 2013 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google Inc... (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 28, 2013 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 27, 2013 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cabinet de Avocat, Diana Ramona Gavra, Luris Civilis Association (Gavra, Diana) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 13 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Signed .pdf Order Attached) (ofr, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/25/2013 (ofr, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2013: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2013 Filing 14 RESPONSE (re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) Opposition to motion to dismiss filed byCabinet de Avocat, Diana Ramona Gavra, Luris Civilis Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gavra, Diana) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 22, 2013 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying CMC, Rule 26(f) and ADR Deadlines filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Roger Myers in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Modifying CMC, Rule 26(f) and ADR Deadlines)(Myers, Roger) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR GOOGLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 11 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2013: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2013 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Roger Myers in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Briefing Schedule)(Myers, Roger) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
March 4, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT ( 9 ) Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 3/18/2013. Replies due by 3/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Myers, Roger) (Filed on 3/4/2013) Modified Docket Relationship and Text on 3/5/2013 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2013 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc.. Filed byDiana Ramona Gavra, Luris Civilis Association, Cabinet de Avocat. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Gavra, Diana) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 19, 2013 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cabinet de Avocat, Diana Ramona Gavra, Luris Civilis Association (Gavra, Diana) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 5 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ECF entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 18, 2013 Remarks: Clerk mailed Pacer Registration Forms and DAR to Plaintiff re 5 (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
January 9, 2013 Filing 6 Proposed Order re 5 MOTION Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Cabinet de Avocat, Diana Ramona Gavra, Luris Civilis Association. (gmS, ) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 9, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Cabinet de Avocat, Diana Ramona Gavra, Luris Civilis Association. Responses due by 1/23/2013. Replies due by 1/30/2013. (gmS, ) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 9, 2013 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cabinet de Avocat, Diana Ramona Gavra, Luris Civilis Association.. (gmS, ) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 9, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Google Inc.. (gmS, ) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
December 27, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose.Signed by The Executive Committee on 12/27/2012. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012) (tsh, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2013: # 1 Standing Order) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRAIL against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611081817.). Filed by Diana Ramona Gavra, Luris Civilis Association, Cabinet de Avocat. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2013: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gavra et al v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Ramona Gavra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cabinet de Avocat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luris Civilis Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?