Capodiece et al v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Plaintiff: Terry L Capodiece and Michael J Capodiece
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 5:2013cv00032
Filed: January 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/8/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Show Cause Response due by 7/8/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/3/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING IN PART REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS; AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AS MOOT by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 7 Motion to Strike]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, ORDER CONVERTING MOTION TO DISMISS INTO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [re 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank]. Show Cause Response due by NOON ON 5/8/2013. Hearing on MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT set for 5/9/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/12/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE re 18 Renotice motion hearing, filed by Wells Fargo Bank (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capodiece et al v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L Capodiece
Represented By: Emmanuel Fomukong Fobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Capodiece
Represented By: Emmanuel Fomukong Fobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Tim Gordon Ceperley
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?