Benedict v. Hewlett-Packard Company
Plaintiff: Eric Benedict
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Case Number: 5:2013cv00119
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER DENYING 471 JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS UNDER SEAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 444 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/16/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER REQUIRING UPDATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 448 STIPULATION RE-SETTING DATES FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2016 01:30 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2016 01:30 PM. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER REGARDING REDACTION OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DECERTIFY FLSA COLLECTIVE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER GRANTING 413 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DECERTIFY FLSA COLLECTIVE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 SEALING ORDER RE 405 412 420 427 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER RE 410 STIPULATION REGARDING MODIFIED SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING ON MOTION TO DECERTIFY FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/13/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER GRANTING 391 DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED REDACTIONS TO THE COURT'S ORDER DENYING CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/8/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER GRANTING 317 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE COLLECTIVE ACTION WAIVERS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER ON 357 CASE MANAGEMENT DATES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/17/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER Construing 339 as an administrative motion; ordering Defendant to file a response no later than July 6, 2015. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/30/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 298 Case Management Conference - Further. Plaintiff to Provide Statement of Collective Class to Defendants 04/14/2015, Class Certification Opening Briefs due 05/07/2015, Defense's Opposition to Class Certificati on due 06/22/2015, Plaintiff's Reply to Defense's Opposition due 07/09/2015, Class Certification Hearing set for 7/30/2015 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. The Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions is reset from 12/03/2015 to 11/19/2015 at 9:00 am. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 04/09/2015. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER VACATING January 15, 2015 Case Management Conference. The conference is RESET to April 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/13/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER VACATING CMC AND SETTING DATES re 284 Case Management Statement filed by Eric Benedict. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/8/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER Vacating October 30, 2014 Case Management Conference, and Continuing Case Management Conference to December 11, 2014. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/24/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER re 240 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/9/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER re 273 Status Report Amending Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/4/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 04/21/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER re 156 Supplement to Discovery Dispute Joint Report #2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/7/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION CERTIFICATION AND ISSUANCE OF NOTICE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 2/13/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh denying 105 Motion for Sanctions (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 INTERIM ORDER re 103 Discovery Letter Brief Discovery Dispute Joint Report #2 filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/18/2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 5, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Enforcement of Court Order Requiring Production of Class List by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 67 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion ; granting 80 Motion (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 24, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 62 Stipulation Staying Discovery.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 30, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re: Protective Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 14, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying as moot 41 Motion for TRO and Ordering Parties to Meet and Confer.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER to Meet and Confer. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 10, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 37 Stipulated Protective Order.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re: Meet and Confer and Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement, re 33 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Eric Benedict. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 22, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 28 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on January 30, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benedict v. Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Benedict
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Adam T. Klein
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Represented By: Juno E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Caryn F Horner
Represented By: Wendy M. Lazerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?