Villareal v. Aircom Mechanical Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Adam J Villareal
Defendant: Aircom Mechanical Inc, Scott Goldberg and Daniel Munier
Case Number: 5:2013cv00180
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 64 plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Setting Deadline for Joint Submission of Proposed Judgment. Parties to file proposed judgment by 3/31/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/12/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION, FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/23/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Continuing Final Pretrial Conference; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cousins for Settlement Conference to take place prior to final pretrial conference. Previous referral to Judge Grewal vacated. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/28/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Discharging 27 Second Order to Show Cause. 2/11/2014 hearing vacated. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/6/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Defense Counsel Should Not Be Sanctioned. Attorney Thomas Sheridan to appear in person for Show Cause Hearing set for 2/11/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/3/2014. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Defense Counsel Should Not Be Sanctioned. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/21/2013 01:30 PM, Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, San Jose. Initial case management conference to be held immediately following show cause hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/14/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villareal v. Aircom Mechanical Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam J Villareal
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aircom Mechanical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Munier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?