Hiramanek et al v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Adil Hiramanek and Roda Hiramanek
Defendant: L Michael Clark, Richard Loftus, Jr., Aaron Perksy, Edward Mills, David Yamasaki, Bradford Baugh, Sarah Scofield, Tani Canti-Sakauye, Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County and Judicial Council of California
Case Number: 5:2013cv00228
Filed: January 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ORDER RE BILL OF COSTS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/13/2017. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/8/2017. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 798 ORDER Denying Request for Waiver of Requirements Under General Order No. 58. Signed by Chief Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/27/2017. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 770 ORDER re motion for reconsideration, Dkt. No. 768, and motion for leave to file excess pages, Dkt. No. 767. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/15/2016. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 758 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 712 Motion for New Trial Against Defendant Miller. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 735 , 736 Motion for Reconsideration of September 1, 2016 Summary Judgment Order 711 . (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 741 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte Regarding Procedures for Hearing on Motion for New Trial (denying 733 Ex Parte Application). (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER Denying Leave to File Motions for Reconsideration by Judge Ronald M. Whyte (denying 581 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 582 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 583 Motion for Reconsideration). (rmwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 711 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Regarding Motions for Summary Judgment for Claims Involving McChristian, Plett, and Polumbus. (granting 430 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 438 Motion for Summary Judgment). Case management conference set for 9/16/2016 at 10:30 a.m. Case management conference statement due 9/9/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 704 Order Regarding Testimony of David Merritt. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/4/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 702 Supplemental Order Regarding Trial Demonstrative Materials. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/3/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ORDER ALLOWING ENTRY OF TRIAL EQUIPMENT, granting 694 . Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 8/1/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 692 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (Re: 671 , 675 , 676 , 677 , 678 , 684 , 685 , 688 , 689 ). (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016).
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER Following Pretrial Conference. (Also denying without prejudice 663 ). Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/18/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 661 Supplemental Order Regarding Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/14/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Regarding Motions in Limine and Other Pretrial Matters (Re: 606 , 607 , 617 , 618 , 619 , 620 , 621 , 622 , 623 , 624 , 625 , 626 , 628 ). (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 655 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte Regarding 577 Motion to Seal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER Setting Case Management Conference. The court will hold a telephonic case management conference on Wednesday, June 22, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. The only topics to be discussed will be the dates of the final pretrial conference and trial for plaintiffs' claims against Miller. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/20/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER re ( 601 , 602 ) Resetting Dates of Final Pretrial Conference and Trial. The final pretrial conference for plaintiffs' claims against defendant Miller will be held on Tuesday, July 19, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6. The jury trial on plaintiffs' claims against defendant Miller will begin on Tuesday, August 2, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/17/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 600 Amended ORDER Re: Request for Continuance of Pretrial Conference and Clarification of Pretrial Deadlines. (Amended version of 599 to correct due date for response.) Responses due 6/16/2016 by 4:00 pm. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/15/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER Requesting Supplemental Case Management Conference Statement. (Re 579 ). Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/11/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 500 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Serve Complaint on U.S. Attorney General. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016).
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying Leave to File Motions for Reconsideration (denying 559 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 560 Ex Parte Application; denying 566 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 567 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 568 Motion for Reconsideration). (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 552 FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER (re 549 Letter Brief filed by Roda K Hiramanek, Adil Hiramanek, 550 Letter filed by Beth Miller, Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County). Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/23/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting in part 435 defendant Superior Court's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 436 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER Regarding Papers Filed After Summary Judgment Deadlines. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/12/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 464 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 427 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Under Rule 54(b) or Certification for Appeal. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 323 ; denying 341 ; denying 354 ; denying 386 ; denying 389 ; denying 390 ; denying 391 ; denying 392 ; denying 393 ; denying 394 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 375 Motion to Amend Complaint.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTIONS re 323 , 341 , 342 , 354 , 386 , 389 , 390 , 391 , 392 , 393 , 394 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 3, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 385 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DKT. NO. 371). (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR MULTIPLE RELIEF by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 381 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 314 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO SEEK THIRD-PARTY DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 318 ; granting 319 ; denying 324 ; granting 325 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION FOR MULTIPLE RELIEF re 323 by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 23, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015) Modified on 10/23/2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND DENYING MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 272 ; granting 278 ; denying 306 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO SEEK THIRD-PARTY DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 307 ; granting 316 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER re 272 , 311 by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 9, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE re 292 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 1, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER DENYING 275 , 276 MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DKT. NO. 269). Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/25/2015. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER DENYING 263 , 264 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DKT. NO. 251). Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/16/2015. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015).
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER on 254 Objection filed by Roda Hiramanek to Magistrate's Order 240 and Non-Consensual Referral. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 218 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 229 Request for Reassignment (rmwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER DENYING EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME re 231 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 6, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 203 Ex Parte Application for leave to amend to add claims related to Burgess (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER 196 Granting Defendants Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara and Beth Miller's Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/1/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER FOLLOWING CASEMANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 3/16/2015. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 181 Motion to Strike (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER revoking IFP status for Appeal No. 14-17056 re 170 USCA Memorandum,. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 10/27/2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 129 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 133 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 107 Motion for Reconsideration.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 4/25/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 79 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs Leave to File a Motion to Amend. Additionally, Further Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2014 09:30 AM is RESCHEDULED to 3/6/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. A Joint CMC Statement shall be filed by 2/27/2014. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/28/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 51 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 40 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re 37 Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/3/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING re 27 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Roda K Hiramanek, Adil K Hiramanek. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/30/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED ORDER re 29 Order on Ex Parte Application for TRO, Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone at TRO, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/29/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 26 Ex Parte Application for TRO; finding as moot 27 Motion to Appear by Telephone; granting in part and denying in part 28 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER. Copy mailed to Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO TRANSFER CASE TO SAN JOSE re 16 Letter filed by Adil Hiramanek, Roda Hiramanek. Copy mailed to Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiramanek et al v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adil Hiramanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roda Hiramanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Michael Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Loftus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Perksy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Yamasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford Baugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tani Canti-Sakauye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judicial Council of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?