Smith v. County of Santa Cruz et al
Plaintiff: Jack Smith
Defendant: County of Santa Cruz, Jim Ross, Jim Hart, State of California, Santa Cruz Superior Court, Santa Cruz Board of Supervisors and Does 1-100
Case Number: 5:2013cv00595
Filed: February 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DENYING BILL OF PARTICULARS, NO. 82 , AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 23, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 26, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/6/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Amended Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice; Denying Defendants' Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/19/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/28/2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 30 Motion to Strike; granting 10 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order Vacating Hearings and Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/20/2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 25, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. County of Santa Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Smith
Represented By: Karla Gottschalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Cruz Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Cruz Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?