Diaz v. Perez et al
Plaintiff: Enrique Diaz
Defendant: M. Perez, R. A. Kessler, R Binkele and B. Hendrick
Case Number: 5:2013cv00621
Filed: February 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Matter settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/4/2016. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER AFTER REMAND REOPENING CASE; OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. The Clerk shall reopen the file, and terminate all defendants except Defendants M. Perez and L. M. Pennisi, Jr., from this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, two copies of the Waiver of Service of Summons, a copy of the amended complaint, (Docket No. 6), all attachments th ereto, and a copy of this order upon Defendants Correctional Officer M. Perez and Sgt. L. M. Pennisi, Jr., at the Salinas Valley State Prison (P.O. Box 1020, Soledad, CA 93960-1020). The Clerk shall also mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 6/16/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/14/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. For the foregoing reasons, the amended complaint is DISMISSED without leave to amend for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/1/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. A. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Binkele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?