Gonzales v. City Of San Jose et al
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Gonzales
Defendant: City Of San Jose, San Jose Police Chief Moore, Yvonne DelaCruz, SJPD SGT Archer, SJPD Homicide Detective Jamie, SJPD Officers Does 1 to Doe 7 and SJPD Officers and Detectives Doe 8 - 50
Case Number: 5:2013cv00695
Filed: February 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER GRANTING 247 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER REQUIRING UPDATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 232 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER RE 232 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/18/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE 185 186 187 188 189 190 191 192 193 194 by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER RE 197 DECLARATION OF STEVEN M. BERKI REGARDING INABILITY TO FILE TRIAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 140 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 146 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 5/19/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART 144 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; INSTRUCTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 3/12/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 100 ; denying 101 ; denying 129 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 CLARIFICATION RE ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL AND DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS re 98 , 95 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 9, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL AND DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 70 ; denying 75 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 69 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference; Case Management Order. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 9/16/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 2nd AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 52 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/18/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 52 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/12/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 39 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/18/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ALLOW THE FILING OF A 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ALLOW THE FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Mary Lou Gonzales. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/30/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/25/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. City Of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Gonzales
Represented By: Steven Michael Berki
Represented By: M. Jeffery Kallis
Represented By: M. Jeffrey Kallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Represented By: Randolph S. Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Jose Police Chief Moore
Represented By: Randolph S. Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne DelaCruz
Represented By: Randolph S. Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJPD SGT Archer
Represented By: Randolph S. Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJPD Homicide Detective Jamie
Represented By: Randolph S. Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJPD Officers Does 1 to Doe 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJPD Officers and Detectives Doe 8 - 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?