Saldivar v. Quddus et al
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Saldivar
Defendant: Zahir's Bistro and Zahir Quddus
Case Number: 5:2013cv00835
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER STAYING AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. The Court ORDERS that all actions in this case and in this Court be STAYED. The Court also ORDERS that the case be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. If any party wishes to reopen the case after the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceedings or if any party secures relief from the automatic stay, it may do so by filing a motion to reopen with the Court. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/08/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/05/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2014 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 8/25/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 8/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/30/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saldivar v. Quddus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zahir's Bistro
Represented By: Kevin Walter Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zahir Quddus
Represented By: Kevin Walter Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Saldivar
Represented By: James Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?