Valverde v. Cogent Communications Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Valverde
Defendant: Cogent Communications Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv00876
Filed: February 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 41 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cogent Communications Inc. ***ALL Deadlines terminated. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/10/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Having reviewed the parties Joint Statement (see Docket Item No. 39) and good cause appearing therefor, the hearing on the Order to Show Cause scheduled for December 13, 2013, is CONTINUED to January 17, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. On or before January 10, 2014, the parties shall file an updated joint statement in response to the Order to Show Cause setting forth the status of settlement efforts as well as the amount of additional time necessary to finalize and f ile a dismissal. The Order to Show Cause shall be automatically vacated and the parties relieved of the obligation to file a joint statement if a stipulated dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) is filed on or before January 10, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/10/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 12/6/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss the action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/7/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE: CONSENT/DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The court orders Plaintiff to file a similar document indicating either his consent or declination to proceed before Magistrate Judge Grewal on or before 9/10/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/6/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. ***9/6/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Motions terminated AS MOOT: 27 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Initial Case Management Conference filed by Christopher Valverde. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/3/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valverde v. Cogent Communications Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Valverde
Represented By: Kyle Roald Nordrehaug
Represented By: Norman B. Blumenthal
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cogent Communications Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Paul Frederick
Represented By: Rebecca Dianne Eisen
Represented By: Theresa C. Mak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?