Farah v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Paul Farah
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and US Bank National Association
Case Number: 5:2013cv01127
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/30/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY. Motions terminated: Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/02/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/6/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE DOCUMENTS. Plaintiff shall register as an ECF user on the court's website and, once he receives an e-filing password, electronically file a notice stating he has received a password. If such notice is filed, defendants shall thereafter be relieved of their duty to serve plaintiff with paper copies of each electronically-filed document. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/19/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 49 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING REQUEST OF APPROVAL OF PROPIA PERSONA NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION re 37 Notice filed by Paul Farah (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONTINUING TIME FOR MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, granting 33 : 8/6/2013 Motion to Dismiss (In Re: Docket No. 29 ) is continued to 8/27/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Response due by 8/6/2013. Reply due by 8/13/2013. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/25/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2013: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING EX PARTE MOTION FOR STAY by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 10 Ex Parte Application ; denying 10 Motion to Stay (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farah v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Farah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?