January 31, 2020 |
Filing
367
***AMENDED*** ORDER re ( 82 in 5:13-cv-01358-EJD) Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, ( 92 in 5:13-cv-01356-EJD) Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, ( 365 in 5:13-cv-01317-EJD) Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/31/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
|
January 29, 2020 |
Filing
365
Order granting 361 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on January 29, 2020.The Clerk shall close the file. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
|
October 24, 2014 |
Filing
337
ORDER denying 333 Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Orders of Magistrate Judge. Payment of the monetary sanctions is STAYED during the pendency of the case-wide stay imposed on 8/20/2014. Once the stay is lifted but at no time sooner, Google may file a motion before the undersigned for an order directing PersonalWeb to pay the sanctions. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/24/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
|
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
335
ORDER RE: MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. Defendants shall file written opposition to 333 Plaintiffs Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order, if any, on or before 9/23/2014. The opposition brief shall not e xceed five (5) pages in length. No reply brief shall be filed or considered. The Motion will then be deemed submitted for decision and the court will issue an order based on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/16/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing
326
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on August 20, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
|
August 19, 2014 |
Filing
325
ORDER Re: Discovery Dispute Joint Report #2 293 ; Discovery Dispute Joint Report #3 291 ; Discovery Dispute Joint Report #4 289 ; Discovery Dispute Joint Report #5 288 ; Discovery Dispute Joint Report #6 290 ; Discovery Dispute Joint Report #7 292 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/19/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
|
July 3, 2014 |
Filing
313
ORDER RE: COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULE 79-5(d). The court extends the deadline for the parties to file declarations pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(d) until 7/8/2014. Failure to file a compliant declaration by the extended deadline will result in an order denying the sealing motions in whole or in part. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/3/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
|
April 23, 2014 |
Filing
285
ORDER TO SUBMIT DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW re 268 Declaration in Support. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/23/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
|
March 21, 2014 |
Filing
280
ORDER DENYING 273 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/21/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing
270
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On or before 12:00 p.m. on 2/27/2014, Defendants shall file a response, not exceeding 5 pages. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/26/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
|
February 13, 2014 |
Filing
267
ORDER GRANTING IN PART 209 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Based on PersonalWeb's Spoliation of Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/13/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
|
February 4, 2014 |
Filing
258
ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. The hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 218 is hereby CONTINUED to 3/7/2014 at 9:00 a.m. On or before 2/10/2014, Defendants shall do the following:1.File the redacted version of the Motion for Summary Judgment as a separate docket entry on ECF. When filing, Defendants shall choose the event motion and schedule the hearing for 3/7/2014. 2.File the unredacted version of the Motion for Summary Judgment as a separate docket entry on ECF under e-seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/4/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
|
January 17, 2014 |
Filing
250
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 206 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint be Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/17/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
|
November 22, 2013 |
Filing
221
ORDER granting 209 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Based on PersonalWeb's Spoliation of Evidence. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/22/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
|
November 21, 2013 |
Filing
220
ORDER REFERRING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 72-1, Defendants' Motion for Sanctions based on Spoilation of Evidence is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for resolution. Defendants shall re-notice the Motion accordingly. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/21/2013. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
|
October 28, 2013 |
Filing
202
RELATED CASE ORDER. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12, the court finds that the above-entitled cases ARE RELATED. Accordingly, the clerk shall administratively relate these files. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/28/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
|
September 26, 2013 |
Filing
194
ORDER CONTINUING/SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court advises the parties in each case that date of the Case Management Conference will not be modified further. Requests to change or continue the date of the conference will not be cons idered and should not be filed. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. ***10/4/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/26/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
|