PersonalWeb Technologies LLC v. NetApp, Inc.
Plaintiff: Level 3 Communications LLC and PersonalWeb Technologies LLC
Defendant: NetApp, Inc.
Mediator: Hesha Abrams
Miscellaneous: Richard D. Egan
Case Number: 5:2013cv01359
Filed: September 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Stay. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE these files. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE these files. These actions are STAYED in their entirety pending final exhaustion of the relevant review proceedings, incl uding any appeals. This order does not preclude any party from moving to reopen this action, when appropriate. Each defendant in each case shall file, on or before January 20, 2013, a notice indicating their consent or declination to be bound by the above-described estoppel limitations. The notice shall not exceed one page in length. Defendants are hereby notified that, absent full consent, the court may sua sponte reconsider this Order. The parties in each case shall submit a joint status repor t apprising the court of the status of the relevant review proceedings on July 13, 2014, and every six months thereafter. These reports shall be filed as separate docket entries on ECF/PACER. The parties in each case shall provide notice to the court within one week of final exhaustion of all relevant review proceedings, including appeals. In their notice, the parties shall request that this matter be reopened, and that a case management conference be scheduled. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on January 13, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014) Modified on 1/13/2014 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 1/13/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING 159 MOTION to Appear by Telephone NETAPP, INC.'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed by NetApp, Inc. Counsel shall arrange for a telephonic appearance through CourtCall. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/28/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER CONTINUING/SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court advises the parties in each case that date of the Case Management Conference will not be modified further. Requests to change or continue the date of the conference will not be con sidered and should not be filed. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/26/2013. *** 10/4/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC v. NetApp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Level 3 Communications LLC
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: David Dewey Wier, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Represented By: Lawrence Milton Hadley
Represented By: Lawrence M. Hadley
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetApp, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Norwood Jameson
Represented By: Jarrad M Gunther
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Gaudet
Represented By: Jennifer Hellmund Forte
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Karineh Khachatourian
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Powers
Represented By: Patrick Shaw Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Hesha Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Richard D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?