Bell et al v. Medtronic, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Scott Bell and April Bell
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc and Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc
Case Number: 5:2013cv01502
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 78 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Scott Bell, April Bell. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/17/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 11, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/11/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
September 4, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 9/4/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
May 13, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting in part and denying in part (42) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:13-cv-01502-LHK; granting in part and denying in part (39) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:13-cv-02049-LHK. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
January 2, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 1/2/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
October 3, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting (10) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:13-cv-01502-LHK; granting in part and denying in part (9) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:13-cv-02049-LHK (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
July 29, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference; Setting Case Management Conference and Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 29, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell et al v. Medtronic, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Bell
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Bell
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc
Represented By: Michael Kevin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc
Represented By: Michael Kevin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?