ACP, Inc. v. Skypatrol, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ACP, Inc.
Defendant: Skypatrol, LLC and Gordon Howard Associates
Case Number: 5:2013cv01572
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Regarding Case Status. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 07/10/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 136 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 142 , 148 ACP's Motions for Summary Judgment. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 129 Administrative Motion to Request Case Management Conference.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Discovery Order re 131 Letter. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/2/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/24/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Discovery Order re 124 , 125 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/17/2017. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 112 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton Denying without Prejudice 105 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 77 Motion to Dismiss Skypatrol's counterclaim; denying 78 Motion to Dismiss Gordon Howard's counterclaims. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 62 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/5/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REMANDED CASE re 51 USCA Mandate. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/3/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/6/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 21 Motion to Set Aside Default (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/21/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACP, Inc. v. Skypatrol, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACP, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Represented By: Jessica Nicole Leal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skypatrol, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Howard Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?