A.K. v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: A.K.
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv01600
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2013 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:12-cv-01179. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Northern District of California. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(jaj)
April 1, 2013 Filing 23 PRELIMINARY TRANSFER ORDER from JPML. (jaj)
February 22, 2013 Filing 22 STIPULATION To Transfer Venue by Google, Inc.. (Hermann, Michael)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier on 2/8/2013. (ajt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 7, 2013 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Transfer Venue by Google, Inc.. (Hermann, Michael)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 motion to file motion to transfer before any motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge G. Patrick Murphy on 1/22/2013. (ktc)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 18, 2013 Filing 18 Consent MOTION Regarding Sequencing of Initial Motion Practice by Google, Inc.. (Hermann, Michael)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Whitty Somvichian, Granting 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael G. Rhodes, Granting 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dylan R. Hale.(bkl)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 16, 2013 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice And Certificate of Service by AttorneyDylan R. Hale $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1871277 by on behalf of Google, Inc.. (Hale, Dylan)
January 16, 2013 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Certificate of Service by AttorneyMichael G. Rhodes $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1871270 by on behalf of Google, Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael)
January 16, 2013 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice And Certificate of Service by AttorneyWhitty Somvichian $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1871258 by on behalf of Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kyle C. Wong. (bkl)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 15, 2013 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AttorneyKyle C. Wong $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1870486 by on behalf of Google, Inc.. (Wong, Kyle)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey M. Gutkin.(bkl)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 15, 2013 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Certificate of Service by AttorneyJeffrey M. Gutkin $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-1869946 by on behalf of Google, Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. Swartwout on behalf of Google, Inc. (Swartwout, Charles)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint (consented). Google, Inc. answer due 2/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier on 12/13/2012. (ajt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 13, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Hermann, Michael)
December 13, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Hermann on behalf of Google, Inc. (Hermann, Michael)
November 19, 2012 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc.. (cekf)
November 16, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Goldenberg on behalf of A.K. (Goldenberg, Mark)
November 15, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Paul Green on behalf of A.K. (Green, Kevin)
November 15, 2012 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0754-1829866.), filed by A.K.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenfeld, Thomas)
November 15, 2012 Filing 1 Case Opened. Filing Fee Due. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 12-cv-1179-GPM-PMF must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Notice/Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge)(drb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.K. v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.K.
Represented By: Brady Richard Dewar
Represented By: Mark Chandler Goldenberg
Represented By: Kevin Paul Green
Represented By: Michael Kai Ng
Represented By: Thomas P Rosenfeld
Represented By: James Matthew Wagstaffe
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gutkin
Represented By: Dylan R. Hale
Represented By: Michael C. Hermann
Represented By: Michael G. Rhodes
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Represented By: Charles J. Swartwout
Represented By: Kyle Christopher Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?