Powell v. Swarthout
Petitioner: Kevin Jerome Powell
Respondent: G. Swarthout
Case Number: 5:2013cv01703
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying 28 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/17/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Order to Show Cause. Response due by 11/10/2014. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Habeas Answer due by 9/2/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/2/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee ; Denying 17 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER 15 Granting Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/3/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/12/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Jerome Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: G. Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?