Think Computer Corporation v. Dwolla, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Think Computer Corporation
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Facebook, Inc., Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP, Stripe, Inc., Coinbase, Inc., Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII Founders Fund, LLC, Pound Payments Escrow Services, Inc., DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, LLC, Union Square Ventures Opportunity Fund, LP, DST Global, Limited, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-B, LP, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC, Union Square Ventures 2012 Fund, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III (AIV), LP, Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP, ActBlue, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, Square, Inc., Facebook Payments, Inc., DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, A-Grade Investments, LLC, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-A, LP, Y Combinator Fund I GP, LLC, Y Combinator S2012, LLC, Airbnb, Inc., A-Grade Investments II, LLC, Dwolla, Inc., Y Combinator Fund II, LP, Max Levchin, SC XII Management, LLC, Gumroad, Inc., Union Square Ventures, LLC, Andreessen Horowitz LLC, Andreesseen Horowitz Fund, I, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II, LP, Y Combinator Fund I, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-B, LP, Brian Chesky, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-Q, LP, GoPago, Inc., Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XV, LLC, Y Combinator Fund II GP, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Fund III, LLC, Y Combinator RE, LLC, Yuri Milner, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Y Combinator, LLC, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-B, LP, Coinlab, Inc., Y Combinator W2013, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III, LP, Sequoia Capital, LLC, Clinkle Corporation, Sequoia Capital XII, LP, Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIV, LLC and Yishan Wong
Case Number: 5:2013cv02054
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
0 Judge: Edward J Davila
1 Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/24/2014. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #91 , #99 , #128 Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #132 Motion for Sanctions. The clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/24/2014. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 157 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michael T. Jones (Jones, Michael) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 156 Request for Judicial Notice filed byThink Computer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibit M, #4 Exhibit N, #5 Exhibit O, #6 Exhibit P, #7 Exhibit Q, #8 Exhibit R, #9 Exhibit S, #10 Exhibit T, #11 Exhibit U)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 7, 2014 Filing 155 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motions to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions(Docket Item Nos. #91 , #128 , #132 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 1/10/2014 at 9:00 AM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 1/10/2014 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motions. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying #153 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/22/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
October 30, 2013 Filing 153 MOTION for Clarification re #106 Certificate of Interested Entities of Defendant Airbnb, Inc. filed by Think Computer Corporation. Responses due by 11/13/2013. Replies due by 11/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 30, 2013 Filing 152 Request for Judicial Notice filed byThink Computer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 14, 2013 Filing 151 REPLY in further support of #92 request for judicial notice filed by A-Grade Investments II, LLC, A-Grade Investments, LLC, Airbnb, Inc., Andreesseen Horowitz Fund, I, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III (AIV), LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-Q, LP, Brian Chesky, (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 10/14/2013) Modified on 10/15/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/15/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2013 Filing 150 REPLY in further support of (re #91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim ) filed by A-Grade Investments II, LLC, A-Grade Investments, LLC, Airbnb, Inc., Andreesseen Horowitz Fund, I, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III (AIV), LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-Q, LP, Brian Chesky, Coinbase, Inc. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 10/14/2013) Modified on 10/15/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2013 Filing 149 Certificate of Interested Entities by GoPago, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase for GoPago, Inc.. Defendant GoPago, Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Rees, Maura) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 148 Joinder re #91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Defendant GoPago, Inc.'s Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by GoPago, Inc.. (Rees, Maura) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 147 REPLY (re #132 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 11(b)(2) and 11(c)(2) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byAndreesseen Horowitz Fund, I, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III (AIV), LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-Q, LP, Y Combinator Fund I GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund I, LP, Y Combinator Fund II GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund II, LP, Y Combinator RE, LLC, Y Combinator S2012, LLC, Y Combinator W2013, LLC, Y Combinator, LLC. (Hausman, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 23, 2013 Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Think Computer Corporation of Defendant GoPago, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 23, 2013 Filing 145 RESPONSE to re #92 Request for Judicial Notice,,,,,,,, in Opposition by Think Computer Corporation. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 23, 2013 Filing 144 RESPONSE (re #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim ) (also re #99 MOTION to Dismiss Count Three) filed byThink Computer Corporation. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 143 RESPONSE (re #132 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 11(b)(2) and 11(c)(2) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byThink Computer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University of RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-16 CERTIFICATION OF DEFENDANT THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY (Flanagan, Sarah) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 141 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University (Flanagan, Sarah) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University re #139 Notice of Appearance (Flanagan, Sarah) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah G. Flanagan (Flanagan, Sarah) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #136 Stipulation Enlarging briefing Schedule filed by Think Computer Corporation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #136 Stipulation, #91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Responses due by 9/23/2013. Replies due by 10/14/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/10/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 9, 2013 Filing 137 RESPONSE (re #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byThink Computer Corporation. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 136 STIPULATION re #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (enlarging briefing schedule) filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 135 Declaration of Gus P. Coldebella in Support of #132 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 11(b)(2) and 11(c)(2) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byDSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Yuri Milner. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Coldebella, Gus) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 134 Declaration of Samuel C. Zun in Support of #132 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 11(b)(2) and 11(c)(2) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byA-Grade Investments II, LLC, A-Grade Investments, LLC, Brian Chesky, Max Levchin, Union Square Ventures 2012 Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures Opportunity Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures, LLC, Yishan Wong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #132 ) (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 133 Declaration of Christopher Green in Support of #132 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 11(b)(2) and 11(c)(2) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byKleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII Founders Fund, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, LLC, SC XII Management, LLC, Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Fund III, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, LP, Sequoia Capital, LLC, Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #132 ) (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 132 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 11(b)(2) and 11(c)(2) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Andreesseen Horowitz Fund, I, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III (AIV), LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-Q, LP, Y Combinator Fund I GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund I, LP, Y Combinator Fund II GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund II, LP, Y Combinator RE, LLC, Y Combinator S2012, LLC, Y Combinator W2013, LLC, Y Combinator, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/19/2013. Replies due by 9/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth G. Hausman in Support of Investor Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Under Rules of Civil Procedure 11(b)(2) and 11(c)(2), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order)(Hausman, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #124 Motion to Stay Case Management Conference. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for 9/6/2013 is hereby stayed until after the Court rules on Defendants Motions. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila 8/29/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 130 Statement FED. R. CIV. P. RULE 7.1 Disclosure Statement by DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Yuri Milner. (Suarez, Juan) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 129 Certificate of Interested Entities by DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Yuri Milner identifying Corporate Parent Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Corporate Parent Access Trust for DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Yuri Milner. (Suarez, Juan) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 26, 2013 Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Joinder in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by ActBlue, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/9/2013. Replies due by 9/16/2013. (Labar, Ivo) (Filed on 8/26/2013) Modified on 8/26/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2013 Filing 127 Certificate of Interested Entities by ActBlue, LLC (Labar, Ivo) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 26, 2013 Filing 126 Certificate of Interested Entities by Think Computer Corporation (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 125 RESPONSE (re #124 MOTION to Stay Case Management Conference Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-3 and 16-2 - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #122 ) filed byThink Computer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 20, 2013 Filing 124 MOTION to Stay Case Management Conference Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-3 and 16-2 - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #122 filed by A-Grade Investments II, LLC, A-Grade Investments, LLC, Airbnb, Inc., Brian Chesky, Coinbase, Inc., Dwolla, Inc., Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Gumroad, Inc., Max Levchin, Pound Payments Escrow Services, Inc., Square, Inc., Stripe, Inc., Union Square Ventures 2012 Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures Opportunity Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures, LLC, Yishan Wong. Responses due by 8/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Thomas) (Filed on 8/20/2013) Modified on 8/20/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2013 Filing 123 Declaration of Samuel C. Zun in Support of #122 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Motion to Stay Case Management Conference Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-3 and 16-2 filed byA-Grade Investments II, LLC, A-Grade Investments, LLC, Airbnb, Inc., Brian Chesky, Coinbase, Inc., Dwolla, Inc., Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Gumroad, Inc., Max Levchin, Pound Payments Escrow Services, Inc., Square, Inc., Stripe, Inc., Union Square Ventures 2012 Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures Opportunity Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures, LLC, Yishan Wong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #122 ) (Brown, Thomas) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 122 *** (POSTED IN ERROR)*** title of the document INCORRECT counsel will refile document with the correct title MOTION to extend Case Management Conference Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-3 and 16-2 filed by A-Grade Investments II, LLC, A-Grade Investments, LLC, Airbnb, Inc., Brian Chesky, Coinbase, Inc., Dwolla, Inc., Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Gumroad, Inc., Max Levchin, Pound Payments Escrow Services, Inc., Square, Inc., Stripe, Inc., Union Square Ventures 2012 Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures Opportunity Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures, LLC, Yishan Wong. Responses due by 9/3/2013. Replies due by 9/10/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Thomas) (Filed on 8/19/2013) Modified on 8/19/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/20/2013
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Order Granting #98 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney C. Thomas Brown for Defendants Sequoia Capital, LLC; Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC; Sequoia Capital XII, LP; SC XII Management, LLC; Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC; Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC; Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC; Sequoia Capital Scout Fund III, LLC; Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP; and Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 8/12/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Order Granting #97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Christopher G. Green for Defendants Sequoia Capital, LLC; Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC; Sequoia Capital XII, LP; SC XII Management, LLC; Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC; Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC; Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC; Sequoia Capital Scout Fund III, LLC; Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP; and Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 8/12/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 119 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Payments, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Facebook, Inc. for Facebook Payments, Inc.. CORRECTION OF DOCKET #112 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 118 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yishan Wong Defendant Yishan Wong's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 117 Certificate of Interested Entities by Union Square Ventures 2012 Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures Opportunity Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures, LLC Defendants Union Square Ventures LLC, Union Square Ventures Opportunity Fund, LP and Union Square Ventures 2012 Fund, LP's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 116 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stripe, Inc. Defendant Stripe, Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 115 Certificate of Interested Entities by Square, Inc. Defendant Square, Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 114 Certificate of Interested Entities by Max Levchin Defendant Max Levchin's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 113 Certificate of Interested Entities by Gumroad, Inc. Defendant Gumroad, Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 112 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** Please see #119 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Payments, Inc. (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013) Modified on 8/12/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2013 Filing 111 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 110 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dwolla, Inc. Defendant Dwolla, Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 109 Certificate of Interested Entities by Coinbase, Inc. Defendant Coinbase, Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 108 Certificate of Interested Entities by Brian Chesky Defendant Brian Chesky's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 107 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pound Payments Escrow Services, Inc. Defendant Balanced, Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 106 Certificate of Interested Entities by Airbnb, Inc. Defendant Airbnb, Inc.'s Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 105 Certificate of Interested Entities by A-Grade Investments II, LLC, A-Grade Investments, LLC Defendants A-Grade Investments, LLC and A-Grade Investments II, LLC's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-16 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Yow as Counsel (Yow, John) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 103 Certificate of Interested Entities by Andreesseen Horowitz Fund, I, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III (AIV), LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-Q, LP, Y Combinator Fund I GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund I, LP, Y Combinator Fund II GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund II, LP, Y Combinator RE, LLC, Y Combinator S2012, LLC, Y Combinator W2013, LLC, Y Combinator, LLC (Hausman, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE by Andreesseen Horowitz Fund, I, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III (AIV), LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-Q, LP, Y Combinator Fund I GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund I, LP, Y Combinator Fund II GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund II, LP, Y Combinator RE, LLC, Y Combinator S2012, LLC, Y Combinator W2013, LLC, Y Combinator, LLC of Disclosure Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Hausman, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth G. Hausman as Counsel (Hausman, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 100 Declaration of Samuel C. Zun in Support of #99 MOTION for Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts One and Two For Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and For Failure to State A Claim Upon which filed by Coinbase, Inc., Dwolla, Inc., Stripe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #99 ) (Zun, Samuel) (Filed on 8/8/2013) Modified on 8/9/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2013 Filing 99 Joinder in Defendants' #91 Motion to Dismiss Counts One and Two For Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and For Failure to State A Claim Upon which Relief can be Granted filed by Coinbase, Inc., Dwolla, Inc., Stripe, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Coinbase, Inc.'s, Dwolla, Inc.'s and Stripe, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Count Three)(Brown, Thomas) (Filed on 8/8/2013) Modified on, (counsel selected incorrect event.) 8/9/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2013 Filing 98 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by C. Thomas Brown ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7911030.) filed by Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII Founders Fund, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, LLC, SC XII Management, LLC, Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Fund III, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, LP, Sequoia Capital, LLC, Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 97 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Green ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7911002.) filed by Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII Founders Fund, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, LLC, SC XII Management, LLC, Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Fund III, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, LP, Sequoia Capital, LLC, Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 96 Statement per FRCP 7.1 by SC XII Management, LLC, Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Fund III, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, LP, Sequoia Capital, LLC, Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 95 Certificate of Interested Entities by SC XII Management, LLC, Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Fund III, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, LP, Sequoia Capital, LLC, Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 94 Statement per FRCP 7.1 by Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII Founders Fund, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, LLC. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 93 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII Founders Fund, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, LLC (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 92 Request for Judicial Notice re #91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed byA-Grade Investments II, LLC, A-Grade Investments, LLC, ActBlue, LLC, Airbnb, Inc., Andreesseen Horowitz Fund, I, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III (AIV), LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-Q, LP, Brian Chesky, Clinkle Corporation, Coinlab, Inc., DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Gumroad, Inc., Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII Founders Fund, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, LLC, Max Levchin, Yuri Milner, Pound Payments Escrow Services, Inc., SC XII Management, LLC, Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Fund III, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, LP, Sequoia Capital, LLC, Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP, Square, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Union Square Ventures 2012 Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures Opportunity Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures, LLC, Yishan Wong, Y Combinator Fund I GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund I, LP, Y Combinator Fund II GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund II, LP, Y Combinator RE, LLC, Y Combinator S2012, LLC, Y Combinator W2013, LLC, Y Combinator, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #91 ) (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by A-Grade Investments II, LLC, A-Grade Investments, LLC, ActBlue, LLC, Airbnb, Inc., Andreesseen Horowitz Fund, I, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III (AIV), LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-Q, LP, Brian Chesky, Clinkle Corporation, Coinlab, Inc., DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Gumroad, Inc., Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII Founders Fund, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, LLC, Max Levchin, Yuri Milner, Pound Payments Escrow Services, Inc., SC XII Management, LLC, Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Fund III, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, LP, Sequoia Capital, LLC, Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP, Square, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Union Square Ventures 2012 Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures Opportunity Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures, LLC, Yishan Wong, Y Combinator Fund I GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund I, LP, Y Combinator Fund II GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund II, LP, Y Combinator RE, LLC, Y Combinator S2012, LLC, Y Combinator W2013, LLC, Y Combinator, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/23/2013. Replies due by 10/14/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING #88 Stipulation to enlarge time to respond to First Amended Complaint and to enlarge briefing schedule on anticipated motions to dismiss filed by Think Computer Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/6/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING #87 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Think Computer Corporation. Andreesseen Horowitz LLP terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/6/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013) Modified text on 8/7/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2013 Filing 88 STIPULATION to enlarge time to respond to First Amended Complaint and to enlarge briefing schedule on anticipated motions to dismiss filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 87 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Andreessen Horowitz LLC without prejudice by Think Computer Corporation (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Patrick Brown and Samuel C. Zun (Brown, Thomas) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting #80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kyle W. Tayman for DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Yuri Milner. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/17/2013.(correcting #81 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/17/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 18, 2013 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Patrick Brown and Samuel C. Zun (Brown, Thomas) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 17, 2013 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Antonio Suarez (Suarez, Juan) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order Granting #79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gus P. Coldebella for DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Yuri Milner. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/17/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 17, 2013 Filing 81 *** POSTED IN WRONG CASE NUMBER *** please ignore Order Granting #80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kyle W. Tayman for DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Yuri Milner. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/17/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013) Modified on 7/18/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2013 Filing 80 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kyle W. Tayman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7854234.) filed by DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Yuri Milner. (Tayman, William) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 17, 2013 Filing 79 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gus Coldebella ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7854184.) filed by DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Yuri Milner. (Coldebella, Gus) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 15, 2013 Filing 78 ActBlue, LLC's ANSWER to Amended Complaint byActBlue, LLC. (Labar, Ivo) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 77 Summons Issued as to Stripe, Inc., Union Square Ventures 2012 Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures Opportunity Fund, LP, Union Square Ventures, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2013 Filing 76 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNION SQUARE VENTURES LLC; UNION SQUARE VENTURES OPPORTUNITY FUND, LP; UNION SQUARE VENTURES 2012 FUND, LP; and Stripe, Inc. Filed by Think Computer Corporation. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 6/21/2013) Modified on 6/24/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/24/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Coinlab, Inc. to Respond to Complaint re #74 Stipulation filed by Coinlab, Inc., FINDING AS MOOT #73 Stipulation filed by Coinlab, Inc. Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1, Plaintiff Think Computer Corporation ("Think Computer") and Defendant Coinlab, Inc. ("Coinlab"), by and through undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate that Coinlab shall have until June 27, 2013 in which to answer or otherwise respond to ThinkComputer's Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/7/2103. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 74 Amended Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Coinlab, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by Coinlab, Inc.. (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/6/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 73 STIPULATION to extend time to respond to re #1 Complaint filed by Coinlab, Inc.. (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/6/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2013 Filing 72 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/30/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 71 CLERKS NOTICE re Inclusion of Case Into E-Filing Program (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing #4 is TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/23/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 21, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Aschenbrener for Plaintiff Think Computer Corporation (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If, by 5/22/2013, an attorney qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of California does not appear in this action to represent Plaintiff, the court will dismiss the action without prejudice. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2013: #1 Certificate of Service) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO THE HONORABLE EDWARD J. DAVILA, UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 5/7/13. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO THE HONORABLE HOWARD R. LLOYD, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 5/7/2013. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 6, 2013 Filing 67 Summons Issued as to Y Combinator W2013, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 66 Summons Issued as to Y Combinator S2012, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 65 Summons Issued as to Y Combinator RE, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 64 Summons Issued as to Y Combinator Fund II GP, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 63 Summons Issued as to Y Combinator Fund II, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 62 Summons Issued as to Y Combinator Fund I GP, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 61 Summons Issued as to Y Combinator Fund I, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 60 Summons Issued as to Y Combinator, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 59 Summons Issued as to Yishan Wong. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 58 Summons Issued as to The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 57 Summons Issued as to Square, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 56 Summons Issued as to Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 55 Summons Issued as to Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 54 Summons Issued as to Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Fund III, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 53 Summons Issued as to Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 52 Summons Issued as to Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 51 Summons Issued as to Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 50 Summons Issued as to SC XII Management, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 49 Summons Issued as to Sequoia Capital XII, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 48 Summons Issued as to Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 47 Summons Issued as to Sequoia Capital, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 46 Summons Issued as to Yuri Milner. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 45 Summons Issued as to Max Levchin. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 44 Summons Issued as to Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XV, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 43 Summons Issued as to Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIV, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 42 Summons Issued as to Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII Founders Fund, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 41 Summons Issued as to Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 40 Summons Issued as to Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 39 Summons Issued as to Gumroad, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 38 Summons Issued as to GoPago, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 37 Summons Issued as to Facebook Payments, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 36 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to Dwolla, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/23/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to DST Global, Limited. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Digital Sky Technologies, Limited. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to Coinlab, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to Coinbase, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to Clinkle Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Brian Chesky. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Pound Payments Escrow Services, Inc. dba Balanced Payments. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Airbnb, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-Q, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-B, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-A, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Andreessen Horowitz Fund III (AIV), LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Andreessen Horowitz Fund III, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-B, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-A, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Andreessen Horowitz Fund II, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-B, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-A, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Andreesseen Horowitz Fund, I, LP. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Andreessen Horowitz LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to A-Grade Investments II, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to A-Grade Investments, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Actblue, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Filing 6 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 Filing 5 Proposed Order re #4 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Think Computer Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Think Computer Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Think Computer Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A-Grade Investments II, LLC., A Grade Investment, LLC, ActBlue, LLC, Airbnb, Inc., Andreesseen Horowitz Fund, I, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III (AIV), LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-A, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-B, LP, Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-Q, LP, Andreessen Horowitz LLC, Brian Chesky, Clinkle Corporation, Coinbase, Inc., Coinlab, Inc., DST Global, Limited, DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC, DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP, Digital Sky Technologies, Limited, Dwolla, Inc., Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook, Inc., GoPago, Inc., Gumroad, Inc., Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII Founders Fund, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XV, LLC, Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, LLC, Max Levchin, Yuri Milner, Pound Payments Escrow Services, Inc., SC XII Management, LLC, Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC, Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Fund III, LLC, Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, LP, Sequoia Capital, LLC, Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP, Square, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Yishan Wong, Y Combinator Fund I GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund I, LP, Y Combinator Fund II GP, LLC, Y Combinator Fund II, LP, Y Combinator RE, LLC, Y Combinator S2012, LLC, Y Combinator W2013, LLC, Y Combinator, LLC., Summons issued., Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 54611013596). Filed by Think Computer Corporation. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2013: #1 Complaint (part 2), #2 Complaint (part 3), #3 Complaint (part 4), #4 Complaint (part 5)) (dhmS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Think Computer Corporation v. Dwolla, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Represented By: Sarah G. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Seed Fund 2013, LP
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Represented By: Christopher G Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stripe, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coinbase, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII Founders Fund, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pound Payments Escrow Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSTG-2 2011 Investors Onshore, LP
Represented By: William Kyle Tayman
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Represented By: Juan Antonio Suarez
Represented By: Gus P. Coldebella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Square Ventures Opportunity Fund, LP
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DST Global, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-B, LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Square Ventures 2012 Fund, LP
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-A, LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-A, LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreessen Horowitz Fund III (AIV), LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Technology Partners XII, LP
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Represented By: Christopher G Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ActBlue, LLC
Represented By: Ivo Michael Labar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSTG-2 2011 Investors DLP, LLC
Represented By: William Kyle Tayman
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Represented By: Juan Antonio Suarez
Represented By: Gus P. Coldebella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Payments, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSTG-2 2011 Advisors, LLC
Represented By: William Kyle Tayman
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Represented By: Juan Antonio Suarez
Represented By: Gus P. Coldebella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-Grade Investments, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-A, LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y Combinator Fund I GP, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y Combinator S2012, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbnb, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-Grade Investments II, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwolla, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y Combinator Fund II, LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Levchin
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC XII Management, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gumroad, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Square Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreessen Horowitz LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreesseen Horowitz Fund, I, LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreessen Horowitz Fund II, LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y Combinator Fund I, LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreessen Horowitz Fund II-B, LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Chesky
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreessen Horowitz Fund III-Q, LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoPago, Inc.
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Represented By: Christopher G Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XV, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y Combinator Fund II GP, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital Scout Fund I, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Represented By: Christopher G Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital U.S. Scout Fund III, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Represented By: Christopher G Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y Combinator RE, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuri Milner
Represented By: William Kyle Tayman
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Represented By: Juan Antonio Suarez
Represented By: Gus P. Coldebella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Sky Technologies, Limited
Represented By: William Kyle Tayman
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Represented By: Juan Antonio Suarez
Represented By: Gus P. Coldebella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y Combinator, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreessen Horowitz Fund I-B, LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coinlab, Inc.
Represented By: Judith Bond Jennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y Combinator W2013, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital Scout Fund II, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Represented By: Christopher G Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreessen Horowitz Fund III, LP
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Represented By: John Thomas Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Represented By: Christopher G Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinkle Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital XII, LP
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Represented By: Christopher G Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital New Projects, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Represented By: Christopher G Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIV, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yishan Wong
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Brown
Represented By: Samuel C. Zun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Think Computer Corporation
Represented By: Michael James Aschenbrener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?