Vera v. Gipson et.al.
Plaintiff: Guillermo Vera
Defendant: //
Case Number: 5:2013cv02146
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. For the foregoing reasons, this action is hereby DISMISSED, without prejudice to Plaintiff's refiling his claims after all available administrative remedies have been exhausted. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/16/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REOPENING CASE; ADDRESSING PENDING MOTIONS. The clerk shall vacate the judgment and reopen this action. This order terminated Docket Item Nos. 9 and 11. Motions terminated: 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Guillermo Vera, 9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Guillermo Vera. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/11/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff was advised that he must respond to the notices within twenty-eight days or the case would be dismissed. The deadline has passed and Plaintiff has not filed the required documents. Accordingly, Plaintiff's case is DISMISSED. The Clerk shall terminate any pending motions and close the file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2013. (CORRECTION OF 4 ORDER). (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vera v. Gipson et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Vera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: //
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?