Zoumboulaskis v. McGinn et al
Plaintiff: Sofia Zoumboulaskis
Defendant: Richard A. McGinn, Robert W. Alspaugh, Leslie G. Denend, Alex W Hart, Robert B Henske, Wenda Harris Millard, Eitan Raff, Jeffrey E. Stiefler, Douglas G. Bergeron, Robert Dykes, Elmore Waller and VeriFone Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv02379
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 63 Motion to Dismiss third amended complaint. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THIS FILE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 09/22/2017. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017) Modified on 9/22/2017 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 48 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Any amended complaint must be filed on or before 12/18/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/3/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. The deadline for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint is 8/8/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/27/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order granting 36 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 8/7/2014.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' joint Case Management Conference statement, the court finds that a conference would not be productive at this time and hereby vacated the 2/7/2014 conference. The court shall set a Case Management Conference, if necessary, in its order on Defendants' anticipated Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/3/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 10 Stipulation signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on October 7, 2013. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zoumboulaskis v. McGinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia Zoumboulaskis
Represented By: Robert I. Harwood
Represented By: Joshua M. Lifshitz
Represented By: Alan Roth Plutzik
Represented By: Samuel K. Rosen
Represented By: Benjamin I. Sachs Michaels
Represented By: Michael Stuart Strimling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. McGinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Alspaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie G. Denend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex W Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B Henske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenda Harris Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eitan Raff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey E. Stiefler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas G. Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmore Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VeriFone Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?