San Francisco Baykeeper v. City of Sunnyvale et al
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Defendant: Bay Counties Waste Services, Inc., City of Sunnyvale and Stevens Creek Quarry, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv02425
Filed: May 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 To Retain Jurisdiction and Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/3/2014. Court retains jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing compliance with the settlement agreement. The clerk shall close the file. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 8 Proposed Order filed by San Francisco Baykeeper. Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/8/13. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's request to continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2013. Case Management Conference continued to 10/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Related deadlines adjusted accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on August 19, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Baykeeper v. City of Sunnyvale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Counties Waste Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sunnyvale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens Creek Quarry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Represented By: Jayni Foley Hein
Represented By: Sejal Choksi-Chugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?