Clear-View Technologies, Inc., v. Rasnick et al
Plaintiff: Clear-View Technologies, Inc.,
Defendant: John H. Rasnick, J. Basil Mattingly, Will Rasnick, Parker Mattingly and M&R Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv02744
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO HOLD HEARING FOR ALL POST-TRIAL MATTERS ON AUGUST 27, 2015. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/12/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER Construing 282 AS AN ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION; ORDERING DEFENDANT TO FILE A RESPONSE NO LATER THAN JULY 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/13/2015. (blflc3, COURT STAF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER SUA SPONTE SHORTENING TIME; ORDERING COUNSEL TO APPEAR FOR HEARING ON THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL ON JULY 9, 2015 AT 9:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/2/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman granting 226 Motion to Dismiss. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman (1) GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's motion to strike the expert report of James A. Turner, and exclude his testimony, and (2) GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to strike the expert report of Earl McCune, and exclude his testimony. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman DENYING 170 Defendants' motion to strike and exclude the testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Dr. Jonathan Neuberger. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's MIL #1; (2) Denying Defendants' MIL #1; (3) Denying Defendants' MIL #2; (4) Granting Defendants' MIL #3; (5) Denying Defendants' MIL #4; (6) Granting Defendants' MIL #5; (7) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' MIL #6. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER STRIKING Parties' Proposed Preliminary Statements and Verdict Forms. The parties are ORDERED to file joint versions of these documents which comply with the Court's Standing Order no later than 5 p.m. Wednesday, May 27, 2015. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/26/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER DISSOLVING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 20, 2015 re 196 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part 127 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman denying 155 Motion to Intervene. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman denying without prejudice 177 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman denying 169 Motion to Shorten Time. The Court will adjudicate the motion to intervene without oral argument, pursuant to Local Rule 7-1(b), following the filing of Stroz Friedberg's Reply. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015).
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Order by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman DENYING 123 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Impleader, or, in the alternative, to Join Parties. The motion hearing scheduled for March 26, 2015 is hereby VACATED. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER RE: MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 126 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/16/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 87 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 23, 2014 re 85 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 52 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER VACATING August 21, 2014 hearing. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/11/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 64 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, denying 64 Motion for Costs. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman granting 58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Beth Labson Freeman denying without prejudice 53 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 23 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference filed by John H. Rasnick, M&R Solutions, LLC, J. Basil Mattingly, Will Rasnick, Parker Mattingly. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2014. Status Conference set for 1/10/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/22/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead filed by John H. Rasnick, M&R Solutions, LLC, J. Basil Mattingly, Will Rasnick, Parker Mattingly. Response due 9/20/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/12/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clear-View Technologies, Inc., v. Rasnick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clear-View Technologies, Inc.,
Represented By: Kimberly Irene Culp
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wallerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Basil Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Rasnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&R Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?