Tung v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tricia Tung
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2013cv03121
Filed: July 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER APPROVING 32 SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND CONTINUING CMC. Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER APPROVING 28 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 is CONTINUED to 7/10/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/5/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 04/21/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tung v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Tung
Represented By: Charles B. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?