Goldstein v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Steven M. Goldstein
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2013cv03504
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 7 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 9 , 10 Motions for Reversal Order. Plaintiff given until 5/30/2014 to properly effect service. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
January 12, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 23 defendant's motion to remand; denying 25 , 31 plaintiff's motions for reversal order and judgment. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 21, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 35 plaintiff's "Motion to Quash Closure of Case and Remand Order"; denying 36 plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
April 17, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Amend Remand Order; denying 40 Motion for Interim Benefits; denying as moot 44 Motion to Appear by Telephone. 4/21/2015 hearing vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
May 18, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 46 , 47 Motion and Revised Motion for Reversal; finding as moot 48 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldstein v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.