Tom Ver LLC v. Organic Alliance, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Tom Ver LLC
Defendant: Organic Alliance, Inc, Parker R. Booth, Mark Y. Klein, Michael Rosenthal, Christopher White and M. Brookstein
Case Number: 5:2013cv03506
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 11, 2015 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 151 Motion for Default Judgment (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2015)
August 4, 2015 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS ORGANIC ALLIANCE AND WHITE, ECF NO 145 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 4, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
July 30, 2015 143 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 30, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 20, 2015 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court VACATES the July 23 conference and CONTINUES the settlement conference to July 28, 2015 at 2:00 PM. Parties are permitted to participate by telephone and must confirm their participation by noon on July 27 with Courtroom Deputy Lili Harrell at 408.535.5343. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/20/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 17, 2015 136 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 17, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
June 17, 2015 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 134 Motion for Default Judgment (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
May 21, 2015 128 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 21, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 20, 2015 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 107 Motion for Summary Judgment (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
March 11, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 11, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 5, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JCMS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 5, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
December 4, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 4, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
September 3, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND MINUTE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 3, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
February 7, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 43 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 23 Motion to enforce TRO (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
August 26, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting preliminary injunction as to Organic Alliance. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/26/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 8, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 7 Ex Parte Application (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tom Ver LLC v. Organic Alliance, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Ver LLC
Represented By: John P. Cardosi
Represented By: Kathryn S. Diemer
Represented By: Dominique Ann Sopko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic Alliance, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker R. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Y. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Brookstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?